Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00238
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 2:30 AM MDT
Defendant
Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (1)
Represented By
Audrey K. James
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Nelson Holtan
Us Attorney Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 10:27 AM MDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (haa) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
3 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. Initial Appearance set for 7/16/2024 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 7/12/2024.(lam) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
Case unsealed as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo per order5 . (alf) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo.(alf) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Unseal Case as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/15/2024. (alf) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF Unsealing Criminal Case as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. (alf) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. (Holtan, Ryan) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
8 8 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (kna) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero: Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo held on 7/16/2024. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. Defendant moves the Court to appoint counsel. Financial Affidavit is submitted and reviewed. The Court grants the motion and appoints FPD counsel, Audrey James. Charges, rights and penalties explained. Defendant acknowledges understanding of the nature of the pending charges. Government is seeking detention in this matter. Defendant submits to the issue of detention. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court orders defendant detained in USMS custody pending resolution of this matter. Arraignment set for 7/19/2024 at 11:45 AM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Attorney for Plaintiff: Ryan Holtan, Attorney for Defendant: Audrey James, FPD. Interpreter: Juanita Zambrana. Probation Officer: Present. Court Reporter: Electronic/Michelle Gonzalves. (Time Start: 2:43:15, Time End: 2:49:20, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
11 11 Oral MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. (tls) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
12 12 DOCKET TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. Audrey K. James for Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo appointed. No attached document. Representation shall continue for any post-sentencing activities initiated by the US Probation Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/16/2024. (tls) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
14 14 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 07/16/2024, filed on 07/17/2024 in case as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. (sg) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
Spanish Interpreter Required in case as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (dle)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo. NOTE: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case. Motion terminated 7 MOTION for Detention filed by USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 07/16/2024. (tls) [2:24-mj-00693-CMR]
Related: [-]
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Bryan Giovanni Vega-Hidalgo (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (dle)
Related: [-]