Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-03454
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Avery A. Bivins (1)
Represented By
Humberto Rolando Dominguez
Humberto R. Dominguez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Abbie D. Waxman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 12:04 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Avery A. Bivins (1). (fbn)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein: Initial Appearance as to Avery A. Bivins held on 7/17/2024. Bond recommendation/set: Avery A. Bivins (1) Government recommends PTD based on danger. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 7/17/2024. Arraignment set for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Pretrial Detention Hearing set for 7/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Humberto Rolando Dominguez for Avery A. Bivins for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 7/17/2024. (Digital 13:59:41; 14:06:12) Signed by Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein on 7/17/2024. (fbn)
Related: [-]