Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00163
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rakesh Jyoti Saran (1)
Terminated: 07/16/2024


Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 4:06 AM CDT
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
1 1 ORDER TRANSFERRING PROBATION/SUPERVISED RELEASE JURISDICTION as to Rakesh Jyoti Saran pursuant to 18 USC 3605 TO the US District Court for Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division FROM Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee Division upon order accepting jurisdiction. Case number in other district: 2:20-cr-00161-LA-1. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/16/2024) (saw)
Related: [-]
2 2 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Probationer/Supervised Releasee Rakesh Jyoti Saran. (Copies of the Docket Sheet, Indictment and Judgment attached) (saw)
Related: [-]