Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00017
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Joshua Alexander Carroll (1)
Represented By
James Glenn Harwood
The Harwood Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alex C Lewis-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Whitney Ohlhausen
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Matt L Tusing-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jeffrey R Haag-DOJ
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 4:12 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
Arrest of Joshua Alexander Carroll. (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT (Clerk note: This case is to remain sealed until the defendant has been arrested/appeared.) as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (mcrd) (mcrd). [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Continuance filed by USA as to Joshua Alexander Carroll. (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
4 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER as to Joshua Alexander Carroll: Initial Appearance set for 5/16/2024 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2000, 341 Pine St., Abilene, TX 79601-5928 before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/16/2024) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 05/15/2024 as to Joshua Alexander Carroll. (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
6 6 (Document Restricted) CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joshua Alexander Carroll. (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker: Initial Appearance as to Joshua Alexander Carroll held on 5/16/2024. Date of Arrest: 5/15/2024. Defendant qualified for appointment of counsel. Orders to be entered. Defendant remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Whitney Ohlhausen; Defense - None. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter None.) (USPO Cannon/Quigley.) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/16/2024) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 20 Order appointing attorney. Attorney James Glenn Harwood for Joshua Alexander Carroll appointed. This appointment continues through any appeal unless counsel is relieved by court order for good cause shown - See Miscellaneous Order 3 Criminal Justice Act Plan. Within one week, the court will contact you via email and provide a link to the eVoucher System. Any work done on an appeal must be billed per circuit instructions. For questions, consult the[LINK:CJA Attorney Information] page or use the[LINK:directory] to contact the courtroom deputy of the appointing judge. Copies of public documents filed prior to this appointment may be obtained via PACER. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/16/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Joshua Alexander Carroll: Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 5/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2000, 341 Pine St., Abilene, TX 79601-5928 before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/16/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing filed by Joshua Alexander Carroll (Harwood, James) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 ORDER granting11 Motion to Continue as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1). Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing RESET for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2000, 341 Pine St., Abilene, TX 79601-5928 before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/16/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker: Preliminary Hearing not held on 5/23/2024 as to Joshua Alexander Carroll. Defendant and defense counsel filed a written waiver with the court. Order to be entered. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Whitney Ohlhausen; Defense - Glenn Harwood. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter None.) (USPO Doran/Quigley.) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
15 15 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John R. Parker: Detention Hearing as to Joshua Alexander Carroll held on 5/23/2024. The judge issued the oral order required by Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Written order to follow. Court took judicial notice of the Pretrial Services Report. Government admits Exhibits 1 and 2 for the purposes of the detention hearing. Exhibits to be destroyed after the hearing or returned to the admitting party. Government argued as to detention. Defense argued as to release. The court grants the governments motion for detention. Order to be entered. Defendant remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Whitney Ohlhausen; Defense - Glenn Harwood. (Exhibits admitted - returned to party) Time in Court - :10. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (Interpreter None.) (USPO Doran/Quigley.) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
16 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER As to Joshua Alexander Carroll: by this order -- issued to the prosecution and defense counsel -- the court confirms the disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and the possible consequences of violating such order under applicable law. This written order is entered pursuant to Rule 5(f)(1) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and is in addition to the oral order entered by the court on the first scheduled court date when both the prosecutor and defense counsel were present. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/23/2024) (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER as to Joshua Alexander Carroll: A preliminary hearing was scheduled on this date as required by Rule 5.1, Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. The defendant filed a waiver of preliminary hearing. The court found that probable cause exists to believe the defendant committed the offense charged. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/23/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Joshua Alexander Carroll. (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge John R. Parker on 5/23/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
Complaint - Unsealed as to Joshua Alexander Carroll. (mcrd) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
20 20 Joint MOTION to Continue Time to Indict filed by USA as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (Ohlhausen, Whitney) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER granting20 Motion to Continue as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1). (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/30/2024) (ada) [6:24-mj-00009-BU]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
23 23 INDICTMENT as to Joshua Alexander Carroll (1) count(s) 1, 2 with Forfeiture Notice. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (ada)
Related: [-]