Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00163
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 3:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Delilah S. Amaya (1)
Represented By
Nathaniel Wenstrup
Office Of The Federal Public Defender (alexandria N/a)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anthony James Rodregous
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 5:13 AM EDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Delilah S. Amaya (1). (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
2 2 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Delilah S. Amaya1 COMPLAINT (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal, filed by USA as to Delilah S. Amaya. (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to Seal until the defendant is arrested as to Delilah S. Amaya (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 3/29/2024. (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala in case as to Delilah S. Amaya. (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
Arrest of Delilah S. Amaya in the Western District of Texas - Austin. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
Case unsealed (per USA - Samir Paul) as to Delilah S. Amaya. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
PR Bond Entered as to Delilah S. Amaya. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Delilah S. Amaya: Initial Appearance set for 4/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
8 8 15 pgs Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Delilah S. Amaya. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Delilah S. Amaya. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
10 10 Request and Authorization for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 04/23/2024. (jlan) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
11 11 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Delilah S. Amaya. (stewart, mariel) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: USA appeared through Samir Paul. Deft appeared w/counsel Nate Wenstrup. Initial Appearance as to Delilah S. Amaya held in EDVA on 4/26/2024. Deft informed of rights, charges and penalties. PH waived in the Texas court. Deft is continued on the same Bond conditions imposed in arresting district (Texas Court) pending trial; Parties do not object. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Delilah S. Amaya. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/26/24. (tfitz, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
14 14 ORDERED that the following Condition of Release shall be added as to Delilah S. Amaya: 1) The defendant shall participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse treatment and counseling if directed by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. All other conditions of release remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 5/6/2024. (Dest, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
15 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Delilah S. Amaya.(Paul, Samir) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 16, 2024
16 16 ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Delilah S. Amaya (1). ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including Thursday, July 18, 2024. Accordingly, the delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing the time within which an indictment must be filed. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 05/16/2024. (wgar, ) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
17 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Anthony James Rodregous appearing for USA. (Rodregous, Anthony) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
18 18 MOTION to Seal Joint Motion to Extend Indictment Deadline by Delilah S. Amaya.(Wenstrup, Nathaniel) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 ORDER granting18 MOTION to Seal Joint Motion to Extend Indictment Deadline as to Delilah S. Amaya (1). The Motion is to be placed under seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/8/2024. (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER granting20 Under Seal Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Indictment by Two Weeks as to Delilah S. Amaya (1). The Indictment Deadline is extended until Thursday, August 1, 2024. The delay resulting from the pending motion for extension shall be excluded in computing time within which an indictment must be filed. No further extension will be granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/8/2024. (Dest) Modified text on 7/10/2024 (jlan) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
20 20 Under Seal Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Indictment by Two Weeks, filed by USA as to Delilah S. Amaya. (Dest) [1:24-mj-00121-WEF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
Set Hearings as to Delilah S. Amaya: Pre-Indictment Plea Hearing set for 8/2/2024 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (kgall)
Related: [-]