California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00178
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 12:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1)
Represented By
John Frederick Garland
Law Office Of John Garland
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info
Cody S. Chapple
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jul 11 2024
DETENTION ORDER as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2024. (Valdez, E)[1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
GPO Jul 15 2024
ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY John Frederick Garland for Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/15/2024. (Lundstrom, T)[1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
GPO Jul 19 2024
STIPULATION to Advance Arraignment and Plea Hearing ORDER as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on July 19, 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Arraignment and Plea Hearing for defendant Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez is advanced from July 25, 2024 to July 24, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Navarro, F)
GPO Oct 15 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Status Conference and Exclude Time as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from October 23, 2024, to January 22, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) and (h)(7)(B)(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jan 14 2025
STIPULATION and ORDER to Set Change of Plea Hearing and Vacate Status Conference as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2025. It is so ordered that the status conference set for January 22, 2025, is vacated. A change of plea hearing is set for January 21, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before District Court Judge Kirk E. Sherriff. Time was previously excluded through January 22, 2025. (Deputy Clerk EV)

Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 1:54 AM PDT
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1). (Lundstrom, T) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 SHACKLING MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2024: Pursuant to Local Rule 401, the Court hereby determined that the appropriate restraint level for Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) is Fully Shackled (USM # 24313-511 ). (Valdez, E) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 7/9/2024 as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez. (Lundstrom, T) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) held on 7/11/2024. Financial affidavit provided on behalf of the defendant. The Court appointed counsel to represent the defendant in this case. Defendant advised of charges, rights, and maximum penalties. Defendant received Complaint; waived reading and advisement of rights - DENIALS ENTERED. Detention hearing held - the government sought detention; defense submitted. The Court ordered defendant DETAINED. Preliminary Examination set for 7/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean . The Court has been notified that an interpreter is required in this action for Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez. It is counsel's responsibility to timely notify the Court Staff Interpreter when a hearing requiring an interpreter is scheduled, continued or cancelled. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. See [LINK:LR 403 - Court Interpreter Services in Criminal Actions.] Government Counsel: Cody Chapple - present. Defense Counsel: Griffin Estes - present. U.S. Pretrial Services Officer: Evette Perez - present. Custody Status: in Custody (FCJ) - present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Corina Lopez Amador. Certified Court Interpreter: Javier Avelar, Language: SPANISH -Oath on File. (Valdez, E) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
7 7 DETENTION ORDER as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2024. (Valdez, E) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
8 8 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Frederick Garland appearing for Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez. Attorney Garland, John Frederick added. (Garland, John) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY John Frederick Garland for Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/15/2024. (Lundstrom, T) [1:24-mj-00076-SAB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Isaac Abraham Sandoval Lopez (1) count(s) 1. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 True Bill
11 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Advance Arraignment and Plea Hearing. (Garland, John)
Related: [-]