New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00394
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 3:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Amy Gallicchio
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Frederick Lawrence Sosinsky
Law Offices Of Frederick L. Sosinsky
contact info
Defendant
Silvia Marines Zapata (2)
Represented By
Patrick Jerome Brackley
Law Office Of Patrick Jerome Brackley
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Edward Charles Robinson
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/05/2025 11:37 AM EST
Monday, March 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Silvia Marines Zapata (1), Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez (2). Violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1956(h). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
Arrest of Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. Attorney Amy Gallicchio for Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez added. (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Silvia Marines Zapata. (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Silvia Marines Zapata. CJA attorney, Susan Walsh appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Silvia Marines Zapata held on 3/19/2024. Bond Hearing as to Silvia Marines Zapata held on 3/19/2024. AUSA Edward Robinson Jr. present for the Government. Defendant present with attorney, Susan Walsh. BAIL DISPOSITION: $50,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by two financially responsible persons; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by pretrial services; Def. to continue or seek employment; Def. to notify pretrial services of any new employment; Def. will not open any new lines of credit or bank accounts without preapproval of pretrial services; Def. will not posses personal identifying information outside of work and with exception of such information for herself and of her children; No contact with any victims or witnesses in the case except in the presence of counsel; No discussion of the case with Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez except in the presence of counsel; Def. to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by: 4/2/2024. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 4/18/2024 on defendant's consent. (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
6 6 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Silvia Marines Zapata. $50,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by two financially responsible persons. Additional conditions... (job) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/9/2024) (job). [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. Federal Defender, attorney Amy Gallicchio appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez held on 3/19/2024. Bond Hearing as to Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez held on 3/19/2024. AUSA Edward C. Robinson Jr. present for the Government. Defendant present with attorney Amy Gallicchio. BAIL DISPOSITION: $75,000 personal recognizance bond; To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by pretrial services; Mental health eval/treatment as directed by pretrial services; Def. to continue or seek employment; Def. to notify PTS of any new employment; Def. will not open any new lines of credit or bank accounts without the approval of PYS; Def. will not posses personal identifying information of others outside of work, with the exception of his minor children; No contact with any victims or witnesses except in the presence of counsel; No discussion of the case with Silvia Marines Zapata, except in the presence of counsel; Def. to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by: 4/2/2024. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 4/18/2024 on defendant's consent. (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. $75,000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by two financially responsible persons. Additional conditions... (job) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frederick Lawrence Sosinsky appearing for Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. Appearance Type: Retained. (Sosinsky, Frederick) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Patrick Jerome Brackley appearing for Silvia Marines Zapata. Appearance Type: Retained. (Brackley, Patrick) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. Time excluded from 4/16/24 until 5/20/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/16/24)(vb) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 AFFIRMATION of Edward C. Robinson Jr. in Support by USA as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (vb) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. Time excluded from 5/17/24 until 6/20/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 5/17/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Edward C. Robinson in Support by USA as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez re:14 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-01017-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. (jm)
Related: [-]
16 16 UNREDACTED INDICTMENT FILED as to Silvia Marines Zapata, Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez. (jm) (Not for Public view pursuant to Standing Order of the court, 24-mc-184.)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT FILED as to Luis Manuel Beltre Ramirez (1) count(s) 1, 2, Silvia Marines Zapata (2) count(s) 1, 2. (jm)
Related: [-]