California Northern District Court
Judge:P Casey Pitts
Case #: 5:24-cv-04398
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
Claire's Inc.
Represented By
Catherine Mary Corfee
Corfee Stone Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Huyn Ku Lee
Defendant
Hyo Sook Lee
Plaintiff
Gerardo Hernandez
Represented By
Tanya Eugene Moore
Moore Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/08 2:06 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal of Action filed by Gerardo Hernandez. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 4:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Claire's Inc.. (Corfee, Catherine)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/30 8:28 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 08/29 6:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/29 5:14 PM
NOTICE by Claire's Inc. defendant declines magistrate (Corfee, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/14 8:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerardo Hernandez. Claire's Inc. served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/14 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerardo Hernandez. Huyn Ku Lee served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/14 8:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gerardo Hernandez. Hyo Sook Lee served on 8/9/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/29 2:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Initial Case Management Conference for 1/15/2025, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 07/26 4:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Gerardo Hernandez (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 07/26 4:16 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerardo Hernandez.. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/22 2:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Claire's Inc., Huyn Ku Lee, Hyo Sook Lee. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Mon 07/22 2:51 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 07/22 9:46 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 07/19 7:45 PM
Proposed Summons. (Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/19 7:42 PM
COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19641679.). Filed by Gerardo Hernandez.(Moore, Tanya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet