New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-05383
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause15:45 Federal Trade Commission Act (unfair or deceptive acts)
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 07, 2025 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
John A. Crotty
Defendant
Sylvia B. Hamer
Defendant
Peter J. Martin J. Mack
Defendant
Peter J. Moschetti, Jr.
Defendant
New York State Gaming Commission
Defendant
Brian O'Dwyer
Defendant
Marissa Shorenstein
Defendant
Jerry Skurnik
Plaintiff
Frederick Pina
90 Vreeland Street
Staten Island, NY 10302


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 12/16 9:56 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:17 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal..(nd)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Mon 12/16 9:57 AM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for17 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Frederick Pina were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals..(nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
17 17 appeal Notice of Interlocutory Appeal Mon 12/16 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from16 Order of Dismissal,,,. Document filed by Frederick Pina..(nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit legal deficiencies in the order of dismissal
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 18 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 12/11 9:11 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD... Plaintiff's amended complaint, filed IFP under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii), with 30 days' leave to replead. The Court denies without prejudice any outstanding motions, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate them. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Court directs the Clerk of Court to hold this matter open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/10/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
15 15 motion In Limine Tue 08/20 4:26 PM
MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 401. Document filed by Frederick Pina.(sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
14 14 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 08/07 11:47 AM
AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Fri 08/02 10:44 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Frederick Pina dated 7/30/2024 re: Plaintiff writes to inform the Court of a clerical error regarding the identification of an exhibit in both the original verified complaint and the amended verified complaint filed in the above-referenced case. Document filed by Frederick Pina.(tro)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/01 12:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against John A. Crotty, Sylvia B. Hamer, Peter J. Martin J. Mack, Peter J. Moschetti, Jr, New York State Gaming Commission, Brian O'Dwyer, Marissa Shorenstein, Jerry Skurnik.Document filed by Frederick Pina. Related document:1 Complaint..(tro)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 07/29 3:38 PM
ORDER denying4 Motion ; denying7 Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court denies as unnecessary Plaintiff's motions for leave to amend the complaint, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate them (ECF 4, 7.). Should Plaintiff choose to amend his complaint as provided by Rule15(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, he may submit an amended complaint with any relevant attachments within 45 days of the date of this order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint within 45 days of the date of this order, the Court will treat the original complaint as the operative pleading. The letter-motion for an exemption from PACER fees is denied without prejudice. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 44445 (1962). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/2024) (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/26 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Wed 07/24 12:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Mon 07/22 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 misc Letter Mon 07/22 1:30 PM
LETTER addressed to Clerk of the Court from Frederick Pina dated 7/17/2024 re: Request for PACER Fee Exemption. Document filed by Frederick Pina.(vba)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/17 4:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Amend Verified Complaint. Document filed by Frederick Pina.(vfr)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Wed 07/17 9:37 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Wed 07/17 9:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
5 5 7 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 07/17 9:35 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:4 MOTION Supplemental Pleading pursuant to Rule 15(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/17 9:34 AM
MOTION re Supplemental Pleading pursuant to Rule 15(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Wed 07/17 9:30 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Frederick Pina consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/17 9:28 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/17 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against John A. Crotty, Sylvia B. Hamer, Peter J. Martin J. Mack, Peter J. Moschetti, Jr, New York State Gaming Commission, Brian O'Dwyer, Marissa Shorenstein, Jerry Skurnik. Document filed by Frederick Pina. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/17 9:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]