Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger
Referred: Helen C Adams
Case #: 4:24-cv-00252
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 2:57 AM CST
Defendant
Westerra Equipment Limited Partnership
Plaintiff
Vermeer Manufacturing Company
Represented By
Roberta F. Howell
Foley & Lardner Llp (madison)
contact info
Connor Sabatino
Foley & Lardner Llp (madison)
contact info
Michael R. Reck
Belin Mccormick, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 12/09 9:17 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (btg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/06 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Vermeer Manufacturing Company dismissing party Westerra Equipment Limited Partnership. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
Monday, October 21, 2024
12 12 order Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/21 8:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 Motion to Extend Service Deadline, for good cause shown. Deadline is extended to 1/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 10/21/2024. (nam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/17 5:05 PM
MOTION extend service deadline re1 Complaint, by Vermeer Manufacturing Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 10/31/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
Friday, August 09, 2024
10 10 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/09 9:29 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Connor A. Sabatino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/9/2024. (nla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF Wed 07/24 10:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Tue 07/23 2:34 PM
Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 8/13/2024. (sml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR 7.1 Packet
7 7 misc Sealed Document Tue 07/23 9:43 AM
Sealed Document re1 Complaint, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
Att: 1 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 2 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 3 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 4 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 5 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 6 Exhibit Sealed,
Att: 7 Exhibit Sealed
Monday, July 22, 2024
6 6 order Leave to File Under Seal Mon 07/22 4:47 PM
TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiff may file under seal the exhibits indicated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/22/2024. (amp)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/22 2:26 PM
TEXT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Roberta R. Howell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/22/2024. (btg)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Leave to File Under Seal Mon 07/22 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Vermeer Manufacturing Company.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 8/5/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Mon 07/22 12:25 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5508924 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear) Mon 07/22 12:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: AIASDC-5508922 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT Declaratory Judgment against Vermeer BC Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5508861., filed by Vermeer Manufacturing Company. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/21/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 10/21/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] ck, Michael
Att: 1 Exhibit A-H (to be filed under seal),
Att: 2 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal