New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:24-bk-11263
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
500 City Island Ave., LLC
500 City Island Ave.
Bronx, NY 10464
Represented By
James J. Rufo
The Law Office Of James J. Rufo
contact info
Mark Bruh
Doj-Ust
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:26 PM EST
Creditor
DD Notes LLC
1010 Northern Blvd., Suite 306
Great Neck, NY 11021
Represented By
Cara M. Goldstein
Terenzi & Confusione, P.C.
contact info
Ronald M. Terenzi
Terenzi & Confusione, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Mark Bruh
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Mon 05/05 3:03 PM
Letter Expired Listing Agreement - Expiration Date of 11/20/2024 Related [+] Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 20
Friday, February 21, 2025
27 27 3 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Fri 02/21 2:25 PM
Order signed on 2/21/2025 Approving The Employment Of Northgate Real Estate Group As Debtor's Real Estate Broker Effective As Of The Date Of The Parties' Retention Agreement Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 25
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 01/21 4:21 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 2 pgs motion Application, Employ Tue 01/21 2:45 PM
Application to Employ Northgate Real Estate Group as Real Estate Broker for the Debtor filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC Responses due by 2/4/2025, with presentment to be held on 2/7/2025 (check with court for location). (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affirmation in Support
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit A (Corbin Declaration)
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit B (Retention Agreement)
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
24 24 plan Chapter 11 Plan Tue 11/19 7:37 PM
Chapter 11 Plan filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
23 23 12 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Tue 11/19 7:37 PM
Disclosure Statement filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Wed 11/13 2:55 PM
Order signed on 11/13/2024 Approving Employment Of Henry Djonbalaj of Henry Djonbalaj Real Estate, LLC As The Debtors NYS Licensed Real Estate Broker Effective as of the August 22, 2024 Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, September 30, 2024
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Mon 09/30 8:56 AM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/4/2024 at 03:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
21 21 3 pgs order Order RE: Application, Employ Thu 08/29 9:37 AM
Order signed on 8/29/2024 Authorizing 500 City Island Ave., LLC To Retain The Law Office of James J. Rufo As Attorney For The Debtor And Debtor-in-Possession Effective As Of The Petition Date Of July 22, 2024. Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, August 26, 2024
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Mon 08/26 4:09 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
20 20 2 pgs motion Application, Employ Fri 08/23 3:49 PM
Application to Employ Henry Djonbalaj as Real Estate Broker for Debtor filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC Responses due by 9/5/2024, with presentment to be held on 9/9/2024 (check with court for location). (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Affirmation in Support of Motion
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit A (Declaration of RE Broker (Djonbalaj) (DocuSign))
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Djonbalaj Listing Agreement)
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service
Monday, August 19, 2024
trustee Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Mon 08/19 2:57 PM
Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors Filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/26/2024 at 03:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
19 19 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 08/14 1:20 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
18 18 order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 08/13 4:27 PM
Order signed on 8/13/2024 Establishing Deadline For Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner Of Notice thereof. Related [+]. Proofs of Claim due by 10/2/2024. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, August 09, 2024
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 08/09 4:46 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/08 10:32 AM
Order signed on 8/8/2024 Scheduling Initial Case Conference Hearing To Be Held On 8/22/2024 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Fri 07/26 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
14 14 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 07/25 4:58 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Cara M. Goldstein on behalf of DD Notes LLC.(Goldstein, Cara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 affidavit of service
13 13 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 07/25 4:56 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Ronald M. Terenzi on behalf of DD Notes LLC.(Terenzi, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 affidavit of service
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 07/23 2:42 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 2 pgs motion Application, Employ Tue 07/23 1:32 PM
Amended Application to Employ The Law Office of James J. Rufo as Debtor's Attorney Related [+] filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC Responses due by 8/12/2024, with presentment to be held on 8/15/2024 (check with court for location). (Rufo, James)
Related: [-] 7
Att: 1 3 pgs Application
Att: 2 Attorney Affidavit Pursuant to Section 329 & FRBP 2016
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Declaration of 3rd Party Payment of Retainer)
Att: 4 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Tue 07/23 12:57 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors /INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS Related [+] filed by Mark Bruh on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/19/2024 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Bruh, Mark)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Tue 07/23 10:42 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/19/2024 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
8 8 motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Mon 07/22 4:06 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Bar Date Order)
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Bar Date Notice)
7 7 motion Application, Employ Mon 07/22 3:48 PM
Application to Employ The Law Office of James J. Rufo as Debtor's Attorney filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC Responses due by 8/5/2024, with presentment to be held on 8/8/2024 (check with court for location). (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Application to Employ
Att: 2 Attorney Affidavit Pursuant to Section 329 & FRBP 2016-1
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Declaration of Norberto Rodriguez for 3rd Party Payment of Retainer)
Att: 4 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Mon 07/22 2:33 PM
Affidavit Pursuant to LR 1007-2 Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Mon 07/22 2:22 PM
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 07/22 2:20 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc List of Equity Security Holders Mon 07/22 2:19 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204 Mon 07/22 2:18 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) Filed by James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/22 2:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/19/2024, Disclosure Statement due by 11/19/2024, Initial Case Conference due by 8/21/2024, Filed by James J. Rufo of The Law Office of James J. Rufo on behalf of 500 City Island Ave., LLC. (Rufo, James)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 07/22 2:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11263 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16722610. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Mon 07/22 2:26 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Harris, Kendra)
Related: [-]