Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:24-cv-01723
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2003 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:13 AM EST
Defendant
GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Patrick Joseph Duggan
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, Llp - Sarasota
contact info
Ryan M. Guerin
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Israel Sullivan
Represented By
Bradley Abraham Tobin
Bradley A. Tobin, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, December 12, 2024
27 27 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 12/12 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RLK)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order Thu 12/12 8:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties announce a 25 settlement. Under Local Rule 3.09(b), this action is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party within sixty days (1) to submit a stipulated form of final order or (2) to move to vacate the dismissal for good cause. The clerk is directed to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/12/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of settlement Wed 12/11 12:11 PM
NOTICE of settlement by GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc. (Duggan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
23 23 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 12/03 10:22 AM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2024. (digital) (LV)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of appearance Tue 12/03 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Guerin on behalf of GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc. (Guerin, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 11/14 10:55 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2024 at 10:15 AM VIA ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 9:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.. (Duggan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 11/12 9:05 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Duggan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 11/12 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Patrick Joseph Duggan on behalf of GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Patrick J. Duggan, Esq.. (Duggan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/05 12:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc., must answer or respond to the 2 Complaint no later than December 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 11/5/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 11/04 12:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.. (Duggan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 service Proof of service Thu 10/24 10:48 AM
RETURN of service executed on 10/21/2024 by Israel Sullivan as to GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc. (Tobin, Bradley) Modified text on 10/24/2024 (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 10/21 12:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Effectuate Service is GRANTED. Plaintiff must prove service no later than November 19, 2024, or this case will be dismissed. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/21/2024. (KMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
13 13 service Summons reissued Fri 10/18 1:40 PM
SUMMONS reissued as to GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc.(JOS)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 10/18 1:28 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File SERVE COMPLAINT by Israel Sullivan.(Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Verified Return of Non-Service
11 11 service Proposed summons Fri 10/18 10:56 AM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Israel Sullivan. (Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 service Proposed summons Thu 10/17 4:48 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Israel Sullivan. (Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 07/24 10:51 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Israel Sullivan. Related case(s): No (Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/24 10:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Israel Sullivan. (Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 07/24 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Bradley Abraham Tobin on behalf of Israel Sullivan. Lead Counsel: Bradley A Tobin. (Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons issued Wed 07/24 8:37 AM
SUMMONS issued as to GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc. (JK)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 07/24 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 07/24 8:20 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/23 2:33 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-1723-KKM-AEP. (AA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against GSP Marketing Technologies, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Israel Sullivan.(Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 3:36 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22320722) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Tobin, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons