Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Brian C Wimes
Case #: 4:24-cv-00476
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 3:26 AM CST
Defendant
Blue Moon Hauling, L.L.C.
Represented By
Stanley B. Bachman
Morefield Speicher Bachman Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Brown
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 101
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Heath and Welfare Fund
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund
Represented By
Garrison Howell
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info
Brandon Eric Wood
Blake & Uhlig, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Mon 12/30 12:48 PM
ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. In the event that thesettlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within 45 days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 12/30/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/27 11:08 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal by Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Heath and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Aaron Brown, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund. (Wood, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/10 10:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2025 01:30 PM by telephone before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Bench Trial set for 9/2/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Signed on 12/10/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 12/10 10:36 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/10/2024. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Garrison Howell. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): No appearance. Time in court: 9:35 am to 9:40 am. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 adr Designation of Neutral - Mediation and Assessment Program Mon 12/02 11:56 AM
DESIGNATION OF NEUTRAL naming Sarah A. Brown(Howell, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 11/26 7:07 PM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Heath and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Aaron Brown, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund. (Howell, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Fri 11/22 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Garrison Howell on behalf of Plaintiffs Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Heath and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Aaron Brown, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund.(Howell, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/25 1:01 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 discov Disclosure of corporate interests Wed 10/23 2:58 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Garrison Howell on behalf of Plaintiffs Aaron Brown, International Union of Operating Engineers Local No. 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Heath and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund.(Howell, Garrison)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Rule 16 Notice Wed 10/23 9:25 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/26/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2024 09:30 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C Wimes. Signed on 10/23/24 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/23 9:12 AM
Defendant Blue Moon Hauling, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of Blue Moon Hauling, L.L.C..(Attorney Stanley B. Bachman added to party Blue Moon Hauling, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Bachman, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
3 3 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Thu 10/03 10:03 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Wood, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
service Summons Issued Tue 07/23 12:20 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blue Moon Hauling, L.L.C.. (Grassano, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Mon 07/22 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Kern, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Garrison Howell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-9112502. Service due by 10/21/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Howell, Garrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B