Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Pamela A Barker
Case #: 1:24-cv-01245
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, CV-24-998902
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
Alexandria Belfield
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
DAS Acquisition Company, LLC
Represented By
Michael D. Hoenig
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz
contact info
Jeffrey R. Vaisa
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz
contact info
Brett S. Krantz
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Denny
Represented By
Michael D. Hoenig
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz
contact info
Jeffrey R. Vaisa
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz
contact info
Brett S. Krantz
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz - Cleveland
contact info
Defendant
Kim Faas
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Fronk
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
Sheri Hug
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
Shawn Kerley
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
Michelle Lambrich
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Pfitzer
Represented By
Andrew Roger Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Sean P. Malone
Malone Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Nations Lending Corporation
Represented By
David J. Hearty
Stefanik & Iosue
contact info
Jeffrey C. Miller
Stefanik & Iosue
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Mon 02/24 1:37 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Dismissing Case
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/12 8:21 AM
Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/12/2025. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 02/11 12:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Nations Lending Corporation. (Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Thu 01/16 8:10 AM
Order [non-document] The Court grants the Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No.27 .) The Parties shall file an entry of dismissal by February 21, 2025. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 1/16/2025.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
27 27 motion Extension (of deadlines) Wed 01/15 4:12 PM
Joint Motion for extension of Time to File Entry of Dismissal until February 21, 2025 filed by Defendant DAS Acquisition Company, LLC.(Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
order Order Mon 12/30 11:15 AM
Order [non-document] Considering the parties' advisement to the Court that this matter has been settled, the Court entered an Order on December 23, 2024, directing the parties to file an entry of dismissal. Accordingly, all pending motions are dismissed without prejudice. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/30/2024. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Mon 12/23 12:08 PM
Order [non-document] The Court has been advised that the parties have settled this matter. Therefore, all future scheduled dates are cancelled. The parties are ordered to file an entry of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order or the Court will issue an order dismissing the case. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 12/23/2024. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
26 26 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 11/21 9:15 AM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alexandria Belfield.(Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, November 15, 2024
25 25 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Fri 11/15 4:12 PM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Nations Lending Corporation. (Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
24 24 resp Reply Thu 11/07 2:49 PM
Reply in support of16 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer. (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for leave Wed 11/06 9:51 AM
Order [non-document] Defendant Belfield's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. No.23 ) is granted. In light of Defendant Belfield's representation therein that she had not previously been served, and Plaintiff's lack of opposition to Defendant Belfield's Motion for Leave, the Court finds that Plaintiff need not submit an application for entry of default, as previously ordered. (Doc. No.21 .) Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/6/2024.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
23 23 motion Leave Tue 11/05 5:01 PM
Unopposed Motion for leave to file Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Alexandria Belfield.(Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
22 22 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 11/05 4:57 PM
Attorney Appearance by Sean P. Malone filed by on behalf of Alexandria Belfield. (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/29 4:03 PM
Order to Show Cause. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit an appropriate application for entry of default and an affidavit in support thereof, or show cause why Defendant Belfield should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 10/29/2024. (P,K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements Fri 10/25 10:28 AM
Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the [LINK:AO121 Copyright Report Form] or AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 11/8/2024. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 resp Opposition Thu 10/24 11:41 PM
Opposition to16 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Nations Lending Corporation. (Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
19 19 resp Reply Fri 10/11 4:55 PM
Reply Defendants DAS Acquisition Company, LLC, Jennifer Denny, Kim Faas, Sarah Fronk, Sherri Hug, Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, and Jeff Pfitzer's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by DAS Acquisition Company, LLC. (Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
18 18 resp Opposition Fri 09/27 9:38 PM
Opposition to10 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, and Motion to dismiss for improper service of process and Conditional Motion for extension of time to serve Defendant Denny filed by Nations Lending Corporation.(Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Missouri Directory of Lawyers Info for Denny,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cardinal Financial WebPage
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
17 17 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 09/24 12:18 PM
Motion to consolidate cases filed by Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer. Related document(s)11 . (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 09/24 12:15 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer. (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Tue 09/24 12:11 PM
Attorney Appearance by Sean P. Malone filed by on behalf of Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer. (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Thu 09/12 9:43 AM
Order [non-document] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Actions (Doc. No.14 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall file a response by September 27, 2024. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 9/12/2024.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
14 14 motion Extension (of deadlines) Wed 09/11 3:00 PM
Motion for extension of deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate until September 27, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Nations Lending Corporation. Related document(s)11 . (Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Service by Clerk Fri 08/30 3:14 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Alexandria Belfield, Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (L,Br)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_doc Request to Clerk for Service Fri 08/30 2:21 PM
Request to Clerk for service upon Alexandria Belfield, Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich, Jeff Pfitzer by Ordinary Mail. filed by Nations Lending Corporation.(Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Mailing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter to Clerk
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 motion Consolidate Cases Wed 08/28 6:44 PM
Motion to consolidate cases filed by Defendant DAS Acquisition Company, LLC.(Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Complaint
10 10 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 08/28 6:36 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and improper service of process filed by Defendant DAS Acquisition Company, LLC.(Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Affidavit Faas,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Affidavit Fronk,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Affidavit Hug,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Affidavit Ploch,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Declaration Denny,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Summons Denny,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Denny Service Return
Friday, August 23, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 08/23 10:45 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Alexandria Belfield, Shawn Kerley, Michelle Lambrich and Jeff Pfitzer. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 oth_doc Praecipe Thu 08/22 1:06 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Nations Lending Corporation.(Hearty, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter regarding Original Summons,
Att: 2 Summons Original Summons - Defendant Michelle Lambrich,
Att: 3 Summons Original Summons - Defendant Jeff Pfitzer,
Att: 4 Summons Original Summons - Defendant Alexandra Belfield,
Att: 5 Summons Original Summons - Defendant Shawn Kerley
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 07/30 9:29 AM
Order [non-document] The Court grants Defendant Jennifer Denny's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. No.7 .) Defendant Denny shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 30, 2024. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/30/2024.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 07/29 4:52 PM
Motion for extension of time until August 30, 2024 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Jennifer Denny.(Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order
6 6 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 07/29 10:47 AM
Motion for extension of time until August 28, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, filed by Kim Faas, Sarah Fronk, Sheri Hug.(Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 07/29 10:37 AM
Attorney Appearance by Sean P. Malone of Malone Law, LLC, filed by on behalf of Kim Faas, Sarah Fronk, Sheri Hug. (Malone, Sean)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 07/29 12:10 PM
Order [non-document] This matter was removed to this Court on 7/22/2024. For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 8/5/2024, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/29/2024. (P,K)
Related: [-]
order Order Mon 07/29 12:12 PM
Order [non-document] Counsel and the parties are hereby advised that this Court will not accept ex parte telephone calls to Chambers regarding substantive issues in pending cases. The Court speaks through its docket. While it may be appropriate to call Chambers regarding routine, non-substantive matters (such as requests for the dial in information for an upcoming status conference, etc.), it is not appropriate under any circumstances for counsel to call Chambers ex parte for guidance or clarification regarding substantive matters, including matters relating to existing case management deadlines, requests to file briefing, and/or inquiries regarding the status of pending motions. All questions regarding substantive matters in pending cases must be filed as a motion on the public docket, with the following exception. If a dispute arises during a deposition that requires this Court's immediate assistance, the parties may call Chambers for assistance, but must do so jointly (and not on an ex parte basis). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/29/2024. (P,K)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 07/29 1:12 PM
Order [non-document] The Court grants the unopposed Motion of Defendants Faas, Fronk, and Hug for Extension of Time. (Doc. No.6 .) Defendants shall file answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 28, 2024. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/29/2024.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 07/26 3:55 PM
Motion for extension of time until August 28, 2024 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant DAS Acquisition Company, LLC.(Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 07/26 4:17 PM
Order [non-document] The Court grants Defendant DAS Acquisition Company's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. No.4 .) Defendant DAS Acquisition Company shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by August 28, 2024. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/26/2024.(P,K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Tue 07/23 10:15 AM
Civil Cover Sheet, filed by DAS Acquisition Company, LLC. Related document(s)1 . (Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Tue 07/23 7:49 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 07/23 7:48 AM
Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 07/23 7:49 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Mon 07/22 5:30 PM
Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-24-998902 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number BOHNDC-12657587.. Filed by DAS ACQUISITION. (Hoenig, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Docket,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Consents