Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Case #: 1:24-cv-02102
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 misc Mail Returned Mon 04/28 12:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Milchin (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/09 3:18 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 4/9/2025. (c/m p lka 4/9/2025 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/08 11:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Milchin (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/25 8:57 AM
ORDER granting14 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting15 Respondents' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Attorney Vickie LeDuc terminated. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 3/25/2025. (c/m p 3/25/2025 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tianna Bethune on behalf of All Defendants (Bethune, Tianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/05 2:22 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by R. Gray, Warden, M. Washington(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Tue 12/10 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Michael Milchin(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Surreply,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 12/02 2:04 PM
Correspondence re: Return Document Letter(c/m p 12/2/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Monday, November 18, 2024
12 12 respm Response Mon 11/18 8:44 AM
RESPONSE re11 Response,9 Response to Order to Show Cause Reply filed by Warden, M. Washington, R. Gray.(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
11 11 respm Response Tue 11/05 12:23 PM
REPLY to9 Government's Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Michael Milchin.(bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Envelope
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 12/56 Fri 10/04 9:09 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Michael Milchin (c/m p 10/4/2024 bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 10/04 7:28 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by R. Gray, M. Washington, Warden by R. Gray, M. Washington, Warden.(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/04 12:20 PM
ORDER granting7 Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time; Respondents' Answer due 10/4/2024. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 9/4/2024. (c/m p 9/4/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/03 9:26 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by R. Gray, Warden, M. Washington(LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of R. Gray, Warden, M. Washington (LeDuc, Vickie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
5 5 misc Supplement Fri 08/16 10:38 AM
Supplement to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Milchin (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, August 09, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement Tue 08/13 8:27 AM
Supplement to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Milchin(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/26 3:36 PM
ORDER that Respondents shall file a response within 40 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 7/26/2024. (c/m p and c/em as directed 7/26/24 ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Mon 07/22 4:19 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Michael Milchin. (c/m to P 7/22/24 - av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 07/22 4:15 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Milchin. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 9 Envelope