North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert T Numbers, II
Case #: 7:24-cv-00653
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Mark Batson
Represented By
Kayla N. McDaniel
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Patrick H. Flanagan
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC
Represented By
Kayla N. McDaniel
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Patrick H. Flanagan
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tongue & Groove, LLC
Represented By
Kayla N. McDaniel
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Patrick H. Flanagan
Cranfill Sumner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna Rudolph
Represented By
L. Michelle Gessner
Gessnerlaw, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 04/25 1:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Batson, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC filed by Anna Rudolph. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/25 1:33 PM
ORDER - Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings DE11 isDENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion to file an amended complaint DE14 is GRANTED. The Plaintiff's amended complaint [DE 14- 2] is deemed timely FILED as of the date of entry of this order. The Defendants may file an answer or refile a revised motion for judgment on the pleadings within the time frame allotted by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/24/2025. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
utility Motion Submitted Thu 03/20 3:38 PM
Motions Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Stay regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ,11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Thu 03/13 8:33 AM
Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to16 Response in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants ,13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/13 8:59 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time13 and finding Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time18 moot. Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings13 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/13/2025. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/18 2:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Stay regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 02/03 2:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Stay regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Mark Batson, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/27 3:00 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tongue & Groove, LLC, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Mark Batson. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 01/23 11:58 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 Response in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants filed by Tongue & Groove, LLC, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Mark Batson. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice-other Tue 01/14 2:28 PM
Notice filed by Anna Rudolph regarding Notice of Deficiency . (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/13 4:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 01/13 4:19 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Stay regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Stay Mon 01/13 4:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Stay regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redline Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Clean Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/11 12:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
12 12 28 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 11/27 12:45 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tongue & Groove, LLC, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Mark Batson. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Wed 11/27 12:43 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Tongue & Groove, LLC, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Mark Batson. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 10/16 2:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mark Batson. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/01 1:50 PM
Affidavit of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by Anna Rudolph served on Mark Batson on September 28, 2024. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service by Process Server,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Returned Envelope for attempted service at same address where served
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/26 3:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Kayla N. McDaniel on behalf of Mark Batson, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC. (McDaniel, Kayla)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Unexecuted Thu 09/26 11:18 AM
Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted filed by Anna Rudolph as to Mark Batson. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emails with Counsel re refusal of Waiver of Service
Thursday, August 22, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Thu 08/22 9:23 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/22 1:30 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including September 26, 2024, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/22/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/21 12:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint filed by Mark Batson, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC. (Flanagan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Case Selected for Mediation Thu 08/15 3:21 PM
Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Selection of Mediator form are available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Mark Batson, Tongue & Groove Realty, LLC, Tongue & Groove, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 07/25 9:22 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Proposed Summons, [1-2] Proposed Summons, [1-3] Proposed,2 Notice of Appearance,3 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" ( the proposed summonses, the notice of appearance, and the financial disclosure statement ) prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 07/25 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
3 3 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 07/22 10:06 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Anna Rudolph (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/22 10:06 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by L. Michelle Gessner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 10:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7700266.), filed by Anna Rudolph. (Gessner, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons