Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Matthew W Mcfarland
Referred: Karen L Litkovitz
Case #: 1:24-cv-00388
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:May 22, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 3:55 AM EST
Judge Matthew W. McFarland
Defendant
PNC Bank N.A.
Represented By
Brian P Downey
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
Demetruis Holder
5625 Fox Horn Circle #108
Louisville, KY 40216


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
35 35 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 05/22 2:20 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming34 Order and Opinion. (kaf) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 05/22 2:19 PM
ORDER AND OPINION: 1. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc.10 ) is GRANTED; 2. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc.6 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3. The case is terminated from the Court's docket. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 05/22/2025. (kaf) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 2:38 PM
NOTICE by Defendant PNC Bank N.A. re31 Response in Opposition to Motion,32 MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON VARIOUS PENDING MOTIONS re25 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus,20 MOTION for Sanctions,10 MOTION to Dismiss ,26 Response in Opposition to Motion,19 MOTION to Strike,30 MOTION to Disqualify C -Supplemental Notice Of Service (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 4:17 PM
MOTION FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON VARIOUS PENDING MOTIONS re25 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus,20 MOTION for Sanctions,10 MOTION to Dismiss ,26 Response in Opposition to Motion,19 MOTION to Strike,30 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/15 4:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
30 30 motion Disqualify Counsel Mon 04/14 2:54 PM
MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder (This document has been filed three times to capture all three filing events). (bjc)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 2:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 Cross MOTION To Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant filed by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder (This document has been filed three times to capture all three filing events). (bjc)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/14 2:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re25 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder (This document has been filed three times to capture all three filing events). (bjc)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/14 2:30 PM
Cross MOTION To Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Holder v. Jacques,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Holder v. Florissant
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 9:52 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Holder v. Jacques,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Holder v. Florissant
Monday, March 24, 2025
25 25 motion Writ of Mandamus Mon 03/24 3:32 PM
MOTION for Writ of Mandamus by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/18 11:42 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (RETURN TO SENDER/UNABLE TO FORWARD) Mail sent to Demetrius Holder as to NEF's to23 Notice &20 MOTION for Sanctions. ***In reviewing docs 20 & 23 Mr. Holder has a new address of 924 E. Main Street #59, Columbus, OH 43205. The Clerk will remail the NEF's to that address and update the docket to reflect that address. (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/25 4:13 PM
NOTICE Regarding Sur-Reply, by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder re19 MOTION to Strike. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/25 2:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/20 11:18 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Strike filed by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 motion Sanctions Wed 02/19 12:27 PM
MOTION for Sanctions and Compliance with Federal Subpoena, by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (vb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 motion Strike Fri 02/07 3:44 PM
MOTION to Strike allegations and claims made by Defendant PNC Bank NA, by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (vb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/04 12:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/23 10:39 AM
NOTICE to Produce Documents by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (mve)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Wed 01/22 9:41 AM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: (1) Defendants have fourteen (14) days to reply to plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss; (2) Plaintiff's request for oral argument on the motion to dismiss is DENIED; and (3) If plaintiff seeks electronic filing rights, he should file a motion substantially similarto the one attached to this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/21/2025. (kh) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
15 15 motion Hearing Wed 01/22 9:28 AM
This Entry is for statistical purposes only. See Doc14 for document. Document14 is a dissimilar pleading and this entry captures the Motion to Compel Hearing event. (kh)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Thu 01/16 10:16 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Friday, January 10, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 01/10 8:25 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be DISMISSED, with prejudice, for want of prosecution. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 01/08/2025. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/22 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. PNC Bank N.A. served on 10/23/2024, answer due 11/13/2024. (bjc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/12 7:59 AM
NOTICE TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING BY DEFENDANT(S) OF MOTION TO DISMISS (kev)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 11/08 3:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant PNC Bank N.A.. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/08 3:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants PNC Bank N.A., The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for PNC Bank N.A... (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P Downey for Defendant PNC Bank N.A. (Downey, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 09/03 7:54 AM
Summons Issued as to PNC Bank N.A. and sent to the U.S. Marshals for service along with a copy of the complaint, Order Issuing Service, and USM-285 Forms. (bjc)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 7:53 AM
COMPLAINT against PNC Bank N.A., filed by Demetruis Holder. (bjc)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/03 7:44 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis upon defendant as directed by plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 09/01/2024. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 2:45 PM
ORDER transferring this case to United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, Western Division at Cincinnati. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/22/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Mon 07/22 2:53 PM
Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 7/22/2024 Case Number 2:24-cv-3427; Case assigned to Judge Matthew W. McFarland. (er)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 07/22 4:34 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (zmc)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 07/22 4:36 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz:1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
3 3 Revised MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re: doc.2 filed by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (mve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 27, 2024
2 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER re1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a revised Motion within fourteen days (14) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/27/2024. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
1 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Demetruis Holder. (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibits Part 1,
Att: 3 Exhibits Part 2,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons Form,
Att: 6 USM Form