Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Edmund A Sargus
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03750
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Case in other court:Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, 24 CV 004712
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:42 AM EST
Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson
Judge Edmund A. Sargus
Defendant
Dale Belknap
642 Mawyer Drive
Columbus, OH 43085
Represented By
Kevin L Murch
Perez & Morris LLC
contact info
Anne Marie Prack
Perez & Morris LLC
contact info
Defendant
CBRE Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
Kevin L Murch
Perez & Morris LLC
contact info
Anne Marie Prack
Perez & Morris LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamisha Beedy
3196 Millstone Lp
Powell, OH 43065
Represented By
Jamie Rae Bailey
Willis Spangler Starling
contact info
Paul Filippelli
Willis Spangler Starling
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/05 2:14 PM
ORDER re9 Stipulation of Dismissal: The parties seek to dismiss only Defendant Dale Belknap, but the stipulation cites no authority. The Court construes the Stipulation to Dismiss as a Motion to Drop Party under Rule 21 and GRANTS the Motion. Defendant Dale Belknap is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/5/2025. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
med Notice Designating Mediator Tue 03/04 10:19 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Peter J Georgiton assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in April 2025, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/03 2:23 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Defendants Dale Belknap, CBRE Inc.. (Prack, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Wed 02/19 11:28 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in April 2025 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 3/3/2025 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/08 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 is VACATED . Initial Disclosures due by 9/13/2024; Discovery due by 3/31/2025; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 10/31/2024; Dispositive motions due by 5/2/2025; Settlement Demand due by 8/23/2024; Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/6/2024; Case is referred to Mediation in 4/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/8/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 08/06 3:39 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Dale Belknap, CBRE Inc.. (Prack, Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/25 2:07 PM
CBRE and Dale Belknap ANSWER to2 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Murch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/23 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 10:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 3:29 PM
ORDER transferring case from the docket of the Honorable Douglas R. Cole to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 7/22/24. (sct)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Mon 07/22 4:20 PM
Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 07/22/2024, Case Number 1:24-cv-383. Case assigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
2 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dale Belknap, CBRE Inc., originally filed on 6/14/2024 in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas by Tamisha Beedy. (kh)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 24CV004712 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10072907), filed by CBRE Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Dale Belknap,
Att: 4 State Court Filings