Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:24-cv-02517
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 3:04 AM CST
Defendant
Parentsquare
Plaintiff
Wayne Norman
1258 Peabody
Memphis, TN 38104


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 order Judgment Mon 03/03 10:51 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 03/03/2025. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/03 10:43 AM
ORDER CONSTRUING8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 03/03/2025. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 03/03 9:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Wayne Norman.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Wed 02/26 12:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Wayne Norman. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 12/16 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Parentsquare. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Copies of DE5 , summonses, the complaint, and US Marshall form 285 were placed in Interoffice Mailbox of US Marshall Service in order to effect service. (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order Thu 12/12 3:37 PM
ORDER granting3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne Norman; Order to Issue and Effect Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 12/12/2024. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/16 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Signed Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Wayne Norman (agj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/22 12:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wayne Norman. (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs cmp Pro Se Complaint Mon 07/22 12:02 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Parentsquare, filed by Wayne Norman.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 envelope
1 1 utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/22 12:00 PM
Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
Related: [-]