Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Marcia A Crone
Referred: Zack Hawthorn
Case #: 9:24-cv-00136
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Sep 05, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Undeliverable Fri 10/04 12:40 PM
Mail sent to Derald Garrett returned as undeliverable re8 Judgment and7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Envelope is marked "Return to Sender, Released from Facility". (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Fri 09/06 9:03 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT: Ordered that plaintiff take nothing and that this lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. All motions not previously ruled on are denied. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/5/2024. (KMH)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 09/06 8:58 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING5 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 9/5/2024. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/29 2:10 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable.5 Report and Recommendations sent to Derald Garrett. Envelope is marked "Return to Sender, Unable to Identify without ID#". (KMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
5 5 misc Report and Recommendations Tue 08/13 10:41 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Complaint filed by Derald Garrett. It is recommended that this case be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 8/12/2024. (KMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/08 2:03 PM
Document3 returned as Inmate Derald Garrett released from facility. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/25 11:37 AM
PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER. Plaintiff shall, within 20 days of the date set forth below, either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in, and deposits into, plaintiff's inmate trust account during the preceding six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/24/24. (ljw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT(Originally document 1 in case 9:24cv1) against IAH Detention Center Facilities Medical Department, filed by Derald Garrett.(ljw)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs order Order Mon 07/22 1:40 PM
ORDER to Sever from case 9:24cv1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 7/19/24.(ljw)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/22 1:42 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw)
Related: [-]