Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Robert D Berger
Case #: 2:12-bk-23121
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2012
Creditor Meeting:Dec 19, 2012
Plan Confirmed:Nov 06, 2014

Debtor
Mark Anthony James
7247 Richland Ave
Kansas City, KS 66111-2575
Represented By
David A. Reed
contact info
Debtor
Carolyn Marie James
7247 Richland Avenue
Kansas City, KS 66111
Represented By
David A. Reed
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
William H Griffin
5115 Roe Blvd Ste 200
Roeland Park, KS 66205
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202

Docket last updated: 12/07/2014 5:08 PM CST
Friday, November 16, 2012
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13,Credit Card) 12-23121 [misc,volp13cc] ( 281.00). Receipt number 9373443,amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Trustee William H Griffin, to be held on 12/19/2012 at 09:00 AM at KC Room 173. Proof of Claim due by 03/19/2013. Confirmation Hearing to be Held on 01/15/2013 at 09:30 AM at KC Room 151. Autogenerated
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $281 Filed by Mark Anthony James, Carolyn Marie James Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 11/23/2012. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, David
2 2 Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Joint Debtor Carolyn Marie James, Debtor Mark Anthony James. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, David
3 3 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Carolyn Marie James, Debtor Mark Anthony James. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, David
4 4 Employee Income Records Filed by Joint Debtor Carolyn Marie James, Debtor Mark Anthony James. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, David