New Jersey District Court
Judge:Susan D Wigenton
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-07957
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-5
Defendant
MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER
Represented By
FOTINI KARAMBOULIS
Jackson Lewis
contact info
RONALD V. SGAMBATI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC
Represented By
FOTINI KARAMBOULIS
Jackson Lewis
contact info
RONALD V. SGAMBATI
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
NAEEMAH SHEPARD-HILL
Represented By
NICHOLAS A PAGLIARA
Pagliara Law Group, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Friday, March 21, 2025
19 19 order Order Fri 03/21 1:41 PM
TEXT ORDER As per today's Telephone Status Conference, the parties shall resume settlement discussions. If the parties are unable to reach a settlement in principle, the Court will conduct a Settlement Conference by way of Videoconference on 5/15/25 at 11:30 a.m., and will provide the parties with the connection information in advance. All parties, client representatives, and/or insurance claims adjusters with ACTUAL AND FULL settlement authority are required to be present at the Conference. The parties shall fax confidential settlement position papers of five (5) pages or less to Chambers (973-645- 4549) on or before 5/13/25. The completion of fact discovery shall be held in abeyance, pending the outcome of the Settlement Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/21/2025. (Allen, Jessica)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Fri 03/21 1:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/21/2025. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Mon 03/17 2:27 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER. (SGAMBATI, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/23 6:08 PM
CONSENT ORDER that the New Jersey Department of Labor is to produce, to Jackson Lewis P.C., any and all unemployment compensation records regarding or relating to Plaintiff in any manner within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/23/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Order Tue 01/21 3:02 PM
Proposed Order Consent Order by MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
15 15 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/13 11:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/13/2025. (nic, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Mon 01/13 11:07 AM
TEXT ORDER As per today's Telephone Status Conference and the parties' joint status letter of 1/6/25, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Document Requests, and Requests to Admit on or before 2/28/25. The parties shall file a joint status letter on or before 3/14/25. A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 3/21/25 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to dial 1-855-244-8681 and then Access Code 23024029552# at the time of the Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/13/2025. (Allen, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
misc Docket Annotation (public) Thu 12/19 10:50 AM
The parties are instructed to dial a new # 1-855-244-8681 and enter Access Code: 23024029552# at the time of the telephone status conference on January 13, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. On or before January 6, 2025, the parties shall file a joint status letter. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
13 13 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Mon 11/04 1:30 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/4/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
12 12 misc Proposed Order Thu 10/31 9:51 AM
Proposed Order Confidentiality Agreement by MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER. (SGAMBATI, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/22 4:07 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2024. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 11/20/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/22/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/22 11:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Initial Scheduling Conference held by way of video conference on 10/22/2024. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
9 9 discov Joint Discovery Plan Thu 10/10 4:19 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER.(SGAMBATI, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD V. SGAMBATI on behalf of MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER (SGAMBATI, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
7 7 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/30 3:02 PM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/30/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/28 2:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER.(KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/07 3:57 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Defendants request for an extension of Time to answer the Complaint through September 2, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/7/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Mon 08/05 3:34 PM
Letter from Ronald V. Sgambati, Esq.. (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/05 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by FOTINI KARAMBOULIS on behalf of MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER (KARAMBOULIS, FOTINI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 2:07 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/23 9:14 AM
COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5, JOHN DOES 1-5, MOUNTAINSIDE NURSING AND REHAB BHC OPERATIONS LLC d/b/a MOUNTAINSIDE SKILLED NURSING AND REHAB, MATTHEW SCHOTTLANDER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15535553) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NAEEMAH SHEPARD-HILL.(PAGLIARA, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/23 10:53 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - D/B/A parties should be added as an ALIAS . Please do not enter them in the First or Last Name Fields . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/23 11:36 AM
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
Related: [-]