Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10832

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Beth A Buchanan
Case #: 1:24-ap-01016
Nature of Suit498 null
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cheryl A. Bruce
36 Maple Street
Cincinnati, OH 45216
Represented By
Cheryl A. Bruce
contact info
Defendant
John W Rose
The Rose Law Office 6240 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 5
Cincinnati, OH 45224
Represented By
John W Rose
contact info
Plaintiff
Public Entities Pool of Ohio
8163 Old Yankee Street, Suite C
Dayton, OH 45458
Represented By
Jeffrey Charles Turner
Surdyk, Dowd & Turner Co., L.P.A.
contact info
David Benjamin Shaver
Surdyk Dowd & Turner Co., Lpa
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
10 10 order Continue Hearing Thu 05/15 10:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Status Hearing on Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/26/2025 at 12:30 PM Cincinnati Courtroom 1 for4 , (mlp)
Related: [-] 9 Order to File
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 motion Continue Hearing Tue 05/13 4:52 PM
Motion to Continue Hearing On Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Public Entities Pool of Ohio (Shaver, David)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Set Hearing
Sunday, May 11, 2025
8 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 05/12 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 05/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)7 Order to Set Hearing
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 order Set Hearing Fri 05/09 7:31 AM
Order Setting Status Conference. Hearing to be held on 5/15/2025 at 01:45 PM Cincinnati Courtroom 1 for4 , Related [+]. (ygv)
Related: [-] 4 Order to File
Thursday, April 24, 2025
6 6 answer Response Thu 04/24 2:41 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Public Entities Pool of Ohio (Shaver, David)
Related: [-] 4 Order to File
Sunday, April 06, 2025
5 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Mon 04/07 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)4 Order to File
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 order File Fri 04/04 3:24 PM
Order Proposing Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Docket Number1 ) Responses Due: 4/25/2025. (cew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Issued Thu 08/08 11:46 AM
Summons Issued on Cheryl A. Bruce Date Issued 8/8/2024, Answer Due 09/9/2024 (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 misc Summons Issued Tue 08/06 10:18 AM
Summons Issued on Cheryl A. Bruce Date Issued 8/6/2024, Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 2:21 PM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01016. (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): Complaint by Public Entities Pool of Ohio against Cheryl A. Bruce. Fee Amount $350 COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE NON-DISCHARGEABILITY OF DEBT AND OBJECTION TO STATEMENT OF INTENTION TO AVOID LIEN (Shaver, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit