Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10832

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Beth A Buchanan
Case #: 1:24-ap-01017
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cheryl A Bruce
36 Maple Street
Cincinnati, OH 45216
Represented By
Cheryl A Bruce
contact info
Plaintiff
Village of Elmwood Place
6118 Vine Street
Cincinnati, OH 45216
Represented By
W Timothy Miller
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/19 4:38 PM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1017 Closed (npg)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 02, 2024
10 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sun 11/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)9 Order (Generic)
Thursday, October 31, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/31 10:23 AM
Disposition of Adversary 1:24-ap-01017 Judgment For Plaintiff (npg)Modified on 10/31/2024 (npg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
9 9 5 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 10/31 10:07 AM
Joint Stipulation and Agreed Order Resolving Adversary Proceeding and Determining Nondischargeability of Debt (Doc.1 ) (npg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice Tue 10/22 4:04 PM
Joint Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place Related [+]. (Miller, W)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place. filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 10/18 1:55 PM
Stipulation with Plaintiff and Defendant as to Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place. (Miller, W)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 09/12 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Scheduling Order
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 12:03 PM
Order Governing Pretrial and Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceedings (or Prehearing and Hearing Procedures in Certain Contested Matters) and Ordering Preliminary Pretrial Statement. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/14/2024. Related [+]. (npg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place
Friday, August 30, 2024
4 4 answer Response Fri 08/30 11:38 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Defendant Cheryl A Bruce (Rose, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Village of Elmwood Place
Friday, August 09, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/09 8:59 AM
Summons Service Executed on Cheryl A Bruce 8/1/2024 (Miller, W)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
2 2 misc Summons Issued Tue 07/23 1:46 PM
Summons Issued on Cheryl A Bruce Date Issued 7/23/2024, Answer Due 08/22/2024 (Miller, W)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/22 5:23 PM
Adversary case 1:24-ap-01017. (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by Village of Elmwood Place against Cheryl A Bruce. Fee Amount $350 (Miller, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Judgments and Entry
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Findings
Att: 3 Summons Requested