Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:24-cv-01351
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 1:48 AM PST
Defendant
Steven Scott Bernard
1500 Cobb Lane Apt 4
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Defendant
Adriana Marie Montiel
1500 Cobb Lane Apt 4
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Defendant
Elias Isaac Montiel
444 Mayan Dr.
Henderson, NV 89014
Defendant
Jennifer Montiel
1500 Cobb Lane Apt 4
Las Vegas, NV 89101
Defendant
Ivan Cortes Perez
6212 Alta Dr.
Las Vegas, NV 89107
Defendant
Oscar Jimenez Salazar
6212 Alta Dr.
Las Vegas, NV 89107
Defendant
Isaac Molina Zavala
6228 Shawnee Ave.
Las Vegas, NV 89107
Plaintiff
Key Insurance Company
Represented By
Philip Goodhart
Thorndal Armstrong, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Stay Case Wed 03/19 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/19/2025 Granting Motion for 90-Day Stay12 . Key Insurance Company requests a 90-day stay of this case based on an Order of Rehabilitation filed in the District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas. That rehabilitation order states that "Key is in such condition that the further transaction of business would be hazardous financially to its policyholders, creditors, or the public." 12 The motion is unopposed and the deadline for opposition has passed. With good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion 12 is GRANTED. This case is stayed through June 16, 2025. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
12 12 motion Motion Stay Case or Discovery Tue 03/04 3:11 PM
First MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/18/2025. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
11 11 misc Notice 4m Dismissal Fri 02/14 12:21 PM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Complaint * in this action was filed on * 7/23/24. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Adriana Marie Montiel. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 3/16/2025. (ASB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
10 10 misc Declaration Tue 10/15 1:22 PM
DECLARATION of Service of Defendant Ivan Cortes Perez re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 misc Declaration Wed 08/14 2:44 PM
DECLARATION of Service of Summons on Defendant, Oscar Jimenez Salazar re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 08/13 2:21 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Defendant Elias Isaac Montiel re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
7 7 misc Affidavit Wed 08/07 12:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Defendant Jennifer Montiel re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Affidavit Wed 08/07 12:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Defendant Steven Scott Bernard re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
5 5 misc Affidavit Thu 08/01 1:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Defendant Isaac Molina Zavala re4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 07/24 8:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 misc Jury Demand Tue 07/23 11:35 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Key Insurance Company. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 07/23 11:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Key Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Med James, Inc. for Key Insurance Company added. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/23 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7754355) by Key Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/2/2024. Proof of service due by 10/21/2024. (Goodhart, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Steven Scott Bernard,
Att: 3 Summons to Elias Isaac Montiel,
Att: 4 Summons to Jennifer Montiel,
Att: 5 Summons to Adriana Marie Montiel,
Att: 6 Summons to Ivan Cortes Perez,
Att: 7 Summons to Isaac Molina Zavala,
Att: 8 Summons to Oscar Jimenez Salazar
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 07/24 8:16 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MAM)
Related: [-]