Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:John W Degravelles
Referred: Richard L Bourgeois, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00595
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Case in other court:19th JDC, Parish of East Baton Rouge, C-749858
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 3:00 AM CST
Defendant
Woman's Hospital Foundation
Represented By
Eric Ray Miller
Kullman Firm - Br
contact info
Molly Joan Gunnels
The Kullman Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brittney Bennett Davidson
Represented By
Jill L Craft
Jill L. Craft Attorney At Law
contact info
William Brett Conrad, Jr.
Jill L. Craft, Attorney At Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 4:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to14 MOTION to Compel and for Incidental Relief Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 filed by Woman's Hospital Foundation.(Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Katie Baker,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Ed Halphen,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jessica Miller
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 order Order on Sealed Motion Mon 04/28 1:12 PM
ORDER granting15 Plaintiff's Sealed Motion For Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal. The Clerk's Office shall file, under seal, the attached documents (R. Docs. 15-2, 15-3) as exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (R. Doc. 14). The deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel remains unchanged. See Local Rule 7(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/28/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
utility 1- Motion(s) Referred Fri 04/18 1:25 PM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:14 MOTION to Compel and for Incidental Relief ,15 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 motion SEALED MOTION (Prior Leave Granted) Thu 04/17 6:23 PM
SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal by Brittney Bennett Davidson(Conrad, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order,
Att: 2 C, sealed portion of attachments to emails,
Att: 3 D, sealed portion of attachments to emails
14 14 motion Compel Thu 04/17 6:02 PM
MOTION to Compel and for Incidental Relief by Brittney Bennett Davidson(Conrad, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit Certification of Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit A, defendant's discovery responses,
Att: 4 Exhibit B, email chain between counsel,
Att: 5 Exhibit C, email chain between counsel,
Att: 6 Exhibit D, email chain between counsel,
Att: 7 Exhibit E, email chain between counsel
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 03/04 1:39 PM
ORDER granting12 Joint Motion for Consent Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/4/2025. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Motion(s) Referred Fri 02/28 9:00 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:12 Joint MOTION for Consent Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 motion Protective Order Thu 02/27 11:43 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Brittney Bennett Davidson(Conrad, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Proposed Pleading; Proposed Protective Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/10 4:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for October 17, 2024 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2024. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 10/10/2024. Discovery due by 4/17/2025. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 1/17/2025. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 2/18/2025. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/31/2025. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 3/3/2025. Discovery from Experts due by 5/1/2025. Motions shall be filed by 5/30/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2025. Pretrial Conference before the District Judge set for 10/9/2025 at 02:30 PM in by video before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/24/2025. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/14/2025. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/21/2025. Jury Trial set for 12/15/2025 - 12/17/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/10/2024. (SGO)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 09/30 2:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Brittney Bennett Davidson. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 order 90 Day Conference Order Wed 07/31 1:08 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 10/17/2024 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counselfor Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 10/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/30/2024. (SGO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 8 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/30 11:17 AM
Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Woman's Hospital Foundation.(Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 07/25 2:24 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Brittney Bennett Davidson. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
utility Motion(s) Referred Thu 07/25 9:56 AM
MOTION(S) REFERRED:5 MOTION to Substitute ECF Doc. 3 Certificate of Interested Persons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency) Thu 07/25 2:41 PM
ORDER granting5 MOTION to Substitute. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 5-1 in place of R. Doc. 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/25/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
5 5 motion Substitute Pleading (In Order to Correct Deficiency) Wed 07/24 3:53 PM
MOTION to Substitute ECF Doc. 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Woman's Hospital Foundation(Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Ex. A Certificate of Interested Persons,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Order
4 4 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/24 11:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Woman's Hospital Foundation d/b/a Woman's Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Womans Hospital Foundation d/b/a/ Womans Hospital for Woman's Hospital Foundation d/b/a Woman's Hospital. (Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 07/24 11:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Woman's Hospital Foundation d/b/a Woman's Hospital identifying Corporate Parent Womans Hospital Foundation d/b/a/ Womans Hospital, Affiliate/Interested Person Jill L Craft, Affiliate/Interested Person Eric Ray Miller, Affiliate/Interested Person W. Brett Conrad, Jr., Affiliate/Interested Person Molly J. Gunnels for Woman's Hospital Foundation d/b/a Woman's Hospital. (Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency with LR 7.1 Wed 07/24 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to1 Notice of Removal,. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Complete Case Opening First) Tue 07/23 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number C-749858. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2781621), filed by Woman's Hospital Foundation d/b/a Woman's Hospital.(Miller, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 17 pgs Exhibit A, State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet