Roger Free v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04102 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Product USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Roger Free
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 10/17 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 6248 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Motion to Substitute Attorney Gregory A Cade in place of David L Selby, II for Plaintiffs (as listed on the Motion Exhibit A). This Order Relates to granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:23-cv-04384-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04102-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04119-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04138-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04159-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04192-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04249-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04258-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04259-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04270-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04274-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04275-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04315-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04342-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04514-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04515-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04517-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04753-RMG. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/17/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, October 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Rasheed Abdullatif, Taryn Penkala Null, Roger Free, James Winston Anderson, John Allen Dear, Calvin Kimbrough, Randy Allen Bassett, Keith James Marzalen, Crystal Sandoval, John Jex, Jr, Christopher Sensi, Marvin Ernest Ellis, Paula Guidry, Harry Stephen Sellers, Wayne Bearb, James Edward Johnson, Michael Slivkoff, John Slunt. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Selby, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Cade on behalf of Roger Free (Cade, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/23 3:31 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/23/2024), Roger Free v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04102-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Minnesota (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11893046.), filed by Roger Free. Service due by 10/21/2024 (mbon) |