Salluce v. Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Jeremy D Peterson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01997 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 12:54 AM PST |
Defendant
Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Salluce
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/27/24 VACATING the 12/10/24 initial scheduling conference and ORDERING parties to serve initial disclosures by 12/20/24; all Fact Discovery shall be completed by 06/11/25; Designation of Expert Witnesses due 07/11/25 with any rebuttal designations due 08/10/25 and all Expert Discovery completed by 09/09/25; Dispositive Motions filed by10/24/25; Final Pretrial Conference set for 04/13/26 at 01:30 PM via Zoom before District Judge Dale A. Drozd with a joint pretrial statement due pursuant to Local Rules 281 and 282; Jury Trial set for 06/16/26 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to this schedule due within 14 days. (Benson, A.) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jacob Salluce. (Wong, Gregory) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER by Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc.. (Stevens, Liesel) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Order
Wed 08/14 1:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/14/2024: On 8/13/2024, the parties filed a5 stipulation to extend the time for defendant to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Pursuant to that stipulation and good cause appearing, defendant shall file a response to plaintiff's complaint no later than 9/13/2024. (Buzo, P) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for 30-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading re1 Complaint by Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc.. Attorney Stevens, Liesel B added. (Stevens, Liesel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc. served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Wong, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Lopez, K) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory P. Wong* *Lyfe Law, LLP* *864 S. Robertson Boulevard Ste 3rd Floor * *Los Angeles, CA 90035*. (Lopez, K) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Sportsman's Warehouse Southwest, Inc. by Jacob Salluce. Attorney Wong, Gregory P. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11647908) (Wong, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |