California Central District Court
Judge:Dolly M Gee
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:24-cv-06169
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 1:07 AM PST
Defendant
Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Michael Geller
Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman And Machtinger LLP
contact info
Michael L. Moran
Mcgrath North Mullin And Kratz, Pc Llo
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC
Represented By
Brian John Wagner
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Brooke McCarthy
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
Brian John Wagner
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Brooke McCarthy
Kutak Rock LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By
Richard C Weston
Weston And Agness LLP
contact info
Shadie Maghareh
Weston And Agness LLP
contact info
Aaron C Agness
Weston And Agness LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
57 57 order Withdraw as Attorney Fri 04/11 11:38 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting56 REQUEST for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney. Attorney Michael L. Moran terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
56 56 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/08 12:38 PM
REQUEST of Michael L. Moran to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.. (Sefton, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order On Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Attorney
55 55 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 11:46 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting54 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren L. Feldman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc., designating Lauren L. Friedman as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
54 54 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Mon 04/07 12:10 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren L. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39455005) filed by Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.. (Sefton, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Apear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
Friday, April 04, 2025
53 53 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 9:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting50 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D. Stupp APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc., designating Eric McKennett Sefton as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
51 51 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 04/01 12:15 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Vincent Mantovani counsel for Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.. Adding Michael V. Mantovani as counsel of record for Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant attorney Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attorney Michael Vincent Mantovani added to party Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mantovani, Michael)
Related: [-]
50 50 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 04/01 11:38 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D. Stupp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39418322) filed by Defendant Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc. Kirsch Transportation Services, Inc.. (Sefton, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application on Non-Resident Attorney to Apear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice