Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Referred: Justin S Anand
Case #: 1:24-cv-03197
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of Dekalb County, 24CV6025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 4:09 AM EST
Defendant
Harborview Decatur LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Mokotoff
Ford & Harrison Llp-Atl
contact info
Kimberly Briana-Maria Myers
Ford & Harrison Llp-Atl
contact info
Kadale Lubin
Ford & Harrison Llp-Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Tabatha Nicole Crosby
Represented By
A. Bradley Dozier, Jr.
Dozier Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
52 52 discov Certificate of Service Wed 05/07 12:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant Harborview Decatur, LLC's Supplemental Production of Documents, Bates labeled, Harborview 1980 through Harborview 3781 by Harborview Decatur LLC.(Myers, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
51 51 2 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Tue 05/06 3:45 PM
ORDER for Service of50 Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/6/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
50 50 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/06 3:41 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint With Prejudice Or, Alternatively, Disqualify Plaintiffs Counsel, And Motion To Exclude Plaintiffs Use Of Deposition Testimony Of Kierica Colbert filed by Harborview Decatur LLC be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/6/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 3:45 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff is to provide supplemental discovery responses, as described in50 Report and Recommendation, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report and Recommendation, and allows Defendant to re-raise any issues, as necessary, based on those supplemental responses, as further explained herein. Court no longer perceives any need for an ongoing stay of discovery. Although discovery had expired by the time the stay was requested, the Court understands that both parties need limited additional time after the resolution of the Motion. Accordingly, the Court extends discovery for a limited period of thirty (30) days. This discovery period will begin fourteen (14) days from the date of this Report and Recommendation. Thus, the discovery deadline, absent further order, is 6/19/2025. All deadlines running from the end of discovery shall run from this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 5/6/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]