Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-01194
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 24, 2024 2:18 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Edwin Perez-Castaneda (1)
Terminated: 07/22/2024
Represented By
Darrell Lee Bryan
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/24/2024 2:57 AM CDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
Arrest (Rule 32) of Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed. (yi7)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
***Set Hearings as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda: Initial Appearance set for 7/22/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (yi7)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 32.1 PROCEEDINGS as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda held on 7/22/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. True Name: Edwin Yovani Perez-Castaneda. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the Form 12 petition. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Identity and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. Waiver of Rule 32.1 Hearing, submitted to the Court. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service to be transported to the charging district, Northern District of TX/Fort Worth Division, as soon as possible. Appearances: Laura Garcia, AUSA; Darrell Bryan, AFPD. (USPO: Robert Weaver) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Noe Murillo, used) (DUSM: Alberto Rios). (df7)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Darrell Lee Bryan, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed. (Bryan, Darrell)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 32.1(a)(5)(B) Documents Received from Northern District of Texas - Fort Worth as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed. (yi7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Executed Warrant
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Edwin Perez-Castaneda (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
3 3 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (df7)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of 32.1 Hearing by Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed. (sas7)
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed.
Related: [-]
6 6 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda. Defendant committed to Northern District of Texas - Fort Worth ( Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (yi7)
Related: [-]
7 7 Rule 32.1(a)(5)(B) Documents Sent to Northern District of TX / Fort Worth Division as to Edwin Perez-Castaneda, filed. (df7) (df7).
Related: [-]