California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Referred: Carolyn K Delaney
Case #: 2:24-cv-01995
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
BLVD Residential, Inc.
Defendant
Crystal Bickford
Defendant
Eastgate Terrace Apartments, LLC.
Defendant
Michelle Keller
Plaintiff
Romona J Wafer
Represented By
Erin Gage Simonitch
California Rural Legal Assistance
contact info
Christopher Brancart
Brancart And Brancart
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 10/18 3:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/2024 GRANTING the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.10 ). This action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. The Court shall retain jurisdiction for purposes of enforcement only. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/14 12:28 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Romona J Wafer. (Brancart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 10/09 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/9/2024: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement (ECF No.8 ), the Court determined this case has settled. In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, dispositional documents are to be filed on or before 11/4/2024. Accordingly, all other deadlines and hearings are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Wood, J)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 10/09 1:36 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Romona J Wafer. Dispositional Docs due by 11/4/2024. (Simonitch, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/11 11:33 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint by Romona J Wafer. (Brancart, Christopher) Modified on 9/11/2024 (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 4:38 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Michelle Keller served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024. (Brancart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 4:35 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Eastgate Terrace Apartments, LLC. served on 8/21/2024, answer due 9/11/2024. (Brancart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 4:33 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: BLVD Residential, Inc. served on 8/19/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. (Brancart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Tue 07/23 12:58 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 07/23 12:58 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *BLVD Residential, Inc., Crystal Bickford, Eastgate Terrace Apartments, LLC., Michelle Keller* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher Brancart* *Brancart and Brancart* *Post Office Box 686* *Pescadero, CA 94060*. (Lopez, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Romona J Wafer. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11646628) (Brancart, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet