Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:24-cv-01750
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
CHHJ Franchising L.L.C.
Represented By
Joshua Ryan Kersey
Shankman Leone PA
contact info
Mitchell L. Fraley
Shankman Leone P.A.
contact info
David S. Shankman
Shankman Leone, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael McRae
Represented By
Sawyer Frescoln
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa
contact info
Luis A. Cabassa
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/10 12:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and the "Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice" (Doc. 29 ), this action is dismissed with prejudice, with all parties to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/10/2025. (DJH)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/10 8:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael McRae. (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/27 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/26 5:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the "Joint Notice of Settlement and Request to Remove Case from Court's Pre-Trial Calendar and Trial Docket" (Doc. 26 ), this cause is hereby dismissed, without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/26/2025. (DJH)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of settlement Wed 02/26 4:21 PM
JOINT NOTICE of settlement and Request to Remove Case from Court's Pre-Trial Calendar and Trial Docket by CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. (Shankman, David) Modified on 2/27/2025 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 02/10 5:56 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 14, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before R. Scott Callen.(Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/06 5:37 PM
NOTICE by CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. of Merger (Shankman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 11/26 8:44 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2024; Discovery due by 8/30/2025; Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2025; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 4/17/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 5/19/2025; Rebuttal disclosure of expert report due by 6/2/2025. Pretrial Conference set for FEBRUARY 17, 2026, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Trial set for term commencing 3/2/2026 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 5 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 11/26/2024. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 11/25 4:29 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Conference set for APRIL 16, 2025, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
21 21 minutes Case Management Conference Mon 11/25 4:28 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Barber: INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 11/20/2024. Court Reporter: Rebekah Lockwood (SRC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of appearance Tue 11/19 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell L. Fraley on behalf of CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. (Fraley, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Time Only Thu 11/14 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 11/20/2024 is rescheduled. New hearing time: NOVEMBER 20, 2024, at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/25 1:30 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for NOVEMBER 20, 2024, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Parties are advised that should they consent to have this entire case heard by the assigned Magistrate Judge, this hearing will be cancelled, and parties will proceed as directed by the Magistrate Judge. Parties wishing to consent to the Magistrate Judge shall file the attached form on or before the date of this hearing. (SRC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 misc Case Management Report Mon 10/21 6:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 10/21 12:06 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. (Shankman, David) Modified text on 10/21/2024 (MGB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 order Order Fri 10/18 4:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are directed to file the joint case management report on or before October 25, 2024. See Local Rule 3.02. Failure to file the report as directed may result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/18/2024. (DJH)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/23 4:42 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint Amended Complaint by CHHJ Franchising L.L.C..(Shankman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/05 4:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint" (Doc. 12 ) is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint on or before September 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/5/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 09/05 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by CHHJ Franchising L.L.C.. (Shankman, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
11 11 service Summons returned executed Fri 08/23 5:02 PM
RETURN of service executed on August 22, 2024 by Michael McRae as to CHHJ Franchising L.L.C.. (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael McRae. (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 08/14 10:12 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael McRae. Related case(s): Yes (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/14 10:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. with Jury Demand. filed by Michael McRae. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Michael McRae.(Cabassa, Luis) Modified text on 8/14/2024 (HAI)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 08/12 11:04 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 08/12 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 07/25 12:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. (BD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
5 5 order Standing Order Thu 07/25 12:48 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/24/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/24 4:41 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-1750-TPB-TGW. (TNP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 07/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Luis A. Cabassa on behalf of Michael McRae. Lead Counsel: Luis A. Cabassa. (Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against CHHJ Franchising L.L.C. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22330874) filed by Michael McRae.(Cabassa, Luis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons