Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:24-cv-01015
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 2:33 AM CST
Defendant
Zoltek
Plaintiff
Charlotta Johnson
PO Box 10932
St. Louis, MO 63135


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
39 39 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 04/28 11:42 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 order A Docket Text Order Wed 04/23 2:06 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:25 MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson,32 MOTION Subpoena by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson,37 MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson; ORDERED PLAINTIFF HAS THE OBLIGATION TO PREPARE SUBPOENAS. IN ADDITION, NO PLACE OF SERVICE HAS BEEN CLEARLY IDENTIFIED OR ENUMERATED. THEREFORE THE MOTIONS ARE DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/23/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/23 2:07 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 38. Copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Wed Apr 23 14:07:00 CDT 2025 (JEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
37 37 motion Pro Se Motion Tue 04/22 1:45 PM
MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
36 36 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 04/21 7:39 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/03 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Zoltek. (Berry, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/25 9:30 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 03/24 2:34 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
32 32 motion Pro Se Motion Mon 03/03 1:34 PM
MOTION Subpoena by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/27 3:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 PRO SE MOTION filed by Defendant Zoltek. (Quill, MaryAnne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
30 30 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Thu 02/20 3:37 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re25 PRO SE MOTION by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
29 29 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 02/13 8:22 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Zoltek.(Berry, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
28 28 motion Dismiss Case Thu 02/13 8:20 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Zoltek. (Berry, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
27 27 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 02/10 2:37 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re25 MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
26 26 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 02/07 2:37 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re25 MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 motion Pro Se Motion Thu 02/06 3:32 PM
MOTION for Subpoenas by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 02/06 3:30 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 02/04 1:51 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zoltek, Toray Industries, Inc... (Berry, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
22 22 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Wed 01/29 2:21 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Zoltek. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CLH)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 9:47 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by MaryAnne Quill for Defendant Zoltek. (Quill, MaryAnne)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 01/27 9:45 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas E. Berry, Jr for Defendant Zoltek. (Berry, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/24 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Charlotta Johnson. Zoltek served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
19 19 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 01/24 3:19 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 3:09 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Zoltek. The summons was hand delivered to Plaintiff. (JEB)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Notice of Process Server Fri 01/24 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson Process Server: Kenneth Tyson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Fri 01/17 2:43 PM
Letter received from Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
14 14 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Wed 12/04 1:47 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Wed 11/20 9:36 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 misc Request (NOT TO BE USED AS A MOTION) Tue 11/12 3:27 PM
Supplement/Protection Request re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (CLH)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 11/08 9:00 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibit re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 11/08 12:21 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 misc Letter Thu 10/17 3:27 PM
Letter received from Charlotta Johnson. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
8 8 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 09/20 2:40 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 09/17 10:21 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (CLH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 misc Letter Tue 09/03 2:08 PM
Letter to clerk of the court from Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson regarding filing fee. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
misc Receipt Wed 09/04 2:10 PM
Receipt: $ 405.00, receipt number 22031 for Civil Filing Fee. (JWD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 08/22 11:58 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in the district court without prepaying fees or costs is DENIED without prejudice. [ECF No.2 ] No later than September 13, 2024, plaintiff must pay the $405 filing fee in its entirety or carefully complete and file another application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Related [+] Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 8/22/2024. (JEB)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 9/13/2024.
misc Order Receipt Thu 08/22 11:58 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Thu Aug 22 11:58:22 CDT 2024 (Bailey, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 08/05 4:01 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL Exhibits re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. Thumb drive was also received by plaintiff and is maintained in the clerk's office. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/24 1:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Charlotta Johnson. (JWD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Zoltek, Jury Demand, filed by Charlotta Johnson.(JWD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 07/24 1:33 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Wed 07/24 1:33 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Wed 07/24 2:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jul 24 14:01:03 CDT 2024 (admin,)
Related: [-]