California Central District Court
Judge:Patricia Donahue
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:24-cv-06227
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
21 21 order Awarding EAJA Fees Mon 04/07 9:21 AM
ORDER AWARDING EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) AND COSTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1920 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue.20 [See Order for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 stip Award of EAJA Fees Thu 04/03 4:41 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $6600. filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro.(Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
19 19 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 02/10 4:33 PM
JUDGMENT OF REMAND by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, Related to: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOLUNTARY REMAND18 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the above-captioned action is remanded to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings consistent with the Stipulation to Remand. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (et)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Remand Case to US Agency Mon 02/10 4:30 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VOLUNTARY REMAND PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR OF 42 U.S.C. 405(g) AND TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter be remanded for further proceedings, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). On remand, the Appeals Council will remand the case to an administrative law judge ("ALJ") for a new decision17 . (et)
Related: [-]
17 17 stip Remand Case to US Agency Mon 02/10 6:31 AM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency Social Security Administration filed by defendant Carolyn Colvin.(Naicker, Tina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Judgment
Friday, January 10, 2025
16 16 order For Order Fri 01/10 5:15 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE15 by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Extend the Briefing Schedule, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until February 17, 2025, to file her responsive brief and Plaintiff shall have until March 3, 2025, to file their reply. (es)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion for Order Fri 01/10 12:20 PM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by defendant Carolyn Colvin.(Naicker, Tina) Modified on 1/10/2025 (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 01/07 5:24 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Naicker counsel for Defendant Martin OMalley. Adding Tina L. Naicker as counsel of record for Carolyn Colvin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Martin OMalley(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Tue 01/07 9:22 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: the2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) is GRANTED. (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
12 12 misc Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Tue 12/17 9:32 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Plaintiff's Compliant (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/18 9:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) (mj) filed by Defendant Martin OMalley.(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4,
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 motion Order Wed 09/11 10:04 AM
REQUEST for Order for ]Proposed] Case Managent Order Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro. (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/19 2:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:24-cv-06227 PD on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
8 8 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Fri 08/16 11:27 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin OMalley. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Martin OMalley(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 07/26 1:12 PM
[IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . See document for details and deadlines. (es)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Fri 07/26 9:35 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro. (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 07/25 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/24 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro, (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 07/24 1:21 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro. (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 07/24 1:20 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro. (Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/24 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Christine Cannizzaro. (Attorney Denise Bourgeois Haley added to party Christine Cannizzaro(pty:pla))(Haley, Denise)
Related: [-]