Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Case #: 4:24-cv-00351
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
Kelli Craft
Defendant
Jennifer Myers
Plaintiff
Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC
Represented By
Marcus Fettinger
Gray Reed & Mcgraw LLP
contact info
Jourdan Johnson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 order 03 - Judgment Case - Dismissed/Terminated Fri 08/30 2:45 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (AGREED PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT) , dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Tue 09/03 12:40 PM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number11 ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/15 1:45 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kelli Craft, Jennifer Myers Related [+] by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 08/02 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kelli Craft Related [+] by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 11:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Jennifer Myers Related [+] by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Friday, July 26, 2024
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 07/26 2:14 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC, Corporate Parent Choice Health at Home, LLC, Corporate Parent Choice Hospice of Oklahoma, LLC, Corporate Parent Kindful Hospice I, LLC for Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC) by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
3 3 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Thu 07/25 8:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 07/25 8:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Assigned to District Judge (declination of consent only) Case - Number Changed Thu 07/25 3:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , assigning this case to a district judge. Assigning case to District Judge Gregory K Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, changing case number to 24-cv-00351-GKF-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 8:55 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kelli Craft, Jennifer Myers (atn, Dpty Clk) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/25/2024) (atn, Dpty Clk). Modified on 7/25/2024 to correct PDF (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3046043) by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/24 3:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kindful Hospice Sapulpa Tulsa, LLC (Fettinger, Marcus)
Related: [-]