Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-04119
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Product USA Inc
Defendant
Innotex Corp
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
Defendant
Milliken & Company
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co LLC
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Veridian Limited
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
Plaintiff
Paula Guidry
Represented By
David L Selby, II
Bailey And Glasser
contact info
Gregory A Cade
Environmental Litigation Group PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 17, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 10/17 3:42 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 6248 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Motion to Substitute Attorney Gregory A Cade in place of David L Selby, II for Plaintiffs (as listed on the Motion Exhibit A). This Order Relates to granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:23-cv-04384-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04102-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04119-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04138-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04159-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04192-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04249-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04258-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04259-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04270-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04274-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04275-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04315-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04342-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04514-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04515-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04517-RMG; granting (5) Motion to Substitute Attorney. in case 2:24-cv-04753-RMG. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/17/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
5 5 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 10/11 12:34 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Rasheed Abdullatif, Taryn Penkala Null, Roger Free, James Winston Anderson, John Allen Dear, Calvin Kimbrough, Randy Allen Bassett, Keith James Marzalen, Crystal Sandoval, John Jex, Jr, Christopher Sensi, Marvin Ernest Ellis, Paula Guidry, Harry Stephen Sellers, Wayne Bearb, James Edward Johnson, Michael Slivkoff, John Slunt. Response to Motion due by 10/25/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Selby, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - list of member cases for substitution of counsel,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 07, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A Cade on behalf of Paula Guidry (Cade, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 07/24 4:17 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/24/2024), Paula Guidry v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04119-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Minnesota (mbon)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/24 4:15 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon)
Related: [-]
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11895884.), filed by Paula Guidry. Service due by 10/22/2024 (mbon)
Related: [-]