California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-06252
Nature of Suit330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 12:31 AM PST
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Denis R. McDonough
Plaintiff
Dameka Hill
Represented By
Christopher B. Ellison
Ellison And Associates Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 27, 2025
16 16 service USM-285 Service of S/C upon USA - Executed Thu 03/27 10:19 AM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 upon Dameka Hill served on 3/25/2025, answer due 5/27/2025, served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Estrella Garcia- Clerk- Authorized to Accept. Remarks: Service on U.S. Attorney General Office- Los Angeles. (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/13 12:07 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The request for entry of default is DENIED for reasons stated in Dkt.14 . Plaintiff is ordered to file proof of service that complies with Rule 4(i) no later than March 27, 2025 or the case will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 03/06 5:51 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice (Other)13 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Clerk to Enter Default - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) Notice (Other) event utilized in docketing this filing. Counsel shall use the SEARCH function on the CM/ECF toolbar for events if you are unsure of the events to use. (3) USM-285 Service of S/C upon USA - Executed dated on 12/19/2024 (Dkt. No.11 ) event utilized in docketing this filing; (4) No proof of service on the US Attorney General in Washington DC. No Proof of service on the US Attorney in Los Angeles; (5) Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/04 5:01 PM
Notice filed by plaintiff Dameka Hill. NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND APPLICATION FOR ENTRY DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT(Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
12 12 misc Response Wed 12/25 3:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Dameka Hill RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 service USM-285 Service of S/C upon USA - Executed Thu 12/19 12:26 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 upon Denis R. McDonough served on 12/11/2024, answer due 2/10/2025, served by PERSONAL service, by Federal statute, upon ARIN ELLISON- AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT. Remarks: Pursuant to department of veteran affairs 36.4821 service should be effectuated at the VA Regional counsel in the jurisdiction where the case was filed. (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/13 3:39 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer.Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/27/2024. (eo)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 07/29 3:04 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/25 2:37 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Denis R. McDonough. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 07/25 9:50 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 07/25 9:49 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 07/25 9:49 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/24 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF DAMEKA HILL, (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 07/24 5:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DAMEKA HILL. (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 07/24 5:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by PLAINTIFF DAMEKA HILL. (Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/24 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37895901 - Fee: $405, filed by PLAINTIFF DAMEKA HILL. (Attorney Christopher B. Ellison added to party DAMEKA HILL(pty:pla))(Ellison, Christopher)
Related: [-]