Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-cv-11906
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
Credit Collection Services, LLC
Represented By
Matthew B Johnson
Messer Strickler Burnette
contact info
Plaintiff
Antaqunic Wise
13883 Eastburn St
Detroit, MI 48205


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Mon 01/06 11:18 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting Stipulation of dismissal (ECF No.15 ). Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 01/06 11:20 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re16 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit, MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/03 1:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Credit Collection Services, LLC (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
order Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 9:23 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court has been notified that this matter has been resolved. Stipulation and proposed order of dismissal to be submitted by 1/3/2025 . Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 12/20 9:24 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit, MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/27 9:09 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Responsive Pleading due by 12/17/2024 . Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 11/27 9:12 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 14 Text-Only Order mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit, MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/26 5:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint on Consent of Plaintiff by Credit Collection Services, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 11/26 5:10 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Credit Collection Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CCS Financial Services, Inc. for Credit Collection Services, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:05 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew B Johnson appearing on behalf of Credit Collection Services, LLC (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 order Vacating Show Cause* Wed 11/06 2:09 PM
Order Vacating8 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Wed 11/06 2:12 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting Plaintiff an additional 60 days to effectuate service. Proof of service to be filed on the docket by 1/6/2025. Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 11/06 2:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Text-Only Order,10 Order Vacating an Order to Show Cause mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
9 9 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 11/06 10:43 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Antaqunic Wise. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
8 8 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Wed 10/23 9:19 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff(s) to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2024 . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 10/23 9:22 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
7 7 service Summonses Provided to Plaintiff for Service* Tue 07/30 11:05 AM
Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (SSch)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued* Tue 07/30 11:04 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Credit Collection Services, LLC* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 07/25 1:02 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 07/25 8:48 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (EVra)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 07/25 1:05 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs mailed to Antaqunic Wise, 13883 Eastburn St., Detroit, MI 48205. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 notice Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal Wed 07/24 3:47 PM
Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal by Antaqunic Wise [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Wed 07/24 3:46 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Antaqunic Wise. [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 07/24 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Antaqunic Wise against Credit Collection Services, LLC [Submitted through Pro Se Portal] (SSch)
Related: [-]