Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Case #: 1:24-cv-02137
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/16 2:15 PM
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice; denying without prejudice1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; closing this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/15/2024. (c/m 10/16/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/05 12:09 PM
ORDER granting Stockett leave to file a reply brief on the Motion for a TRO within 21 days; directing Stockett to file a civil complaint using the forms provided and pay the filing fee or file a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 21 days, if Stockett seeks a ruling on the Motion, and to proceed with a civil action; directing Clerk to amend the docket to identify ECF No. 1 as a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/4/2024. (c/m and forms 9/5/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 respm Response Thu 08/15 3:23 PM
RESPONSE re4 Order, filed by Office of the Attorney General.(Lee, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of John White,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, ARP No. NBCI-1007-24,
Att: 3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Dean Rounds, Jr.,
Att: 4 Exhibit D, Stockett Adjustment History,
Att: 5 Exhibit E, Stockett Traffic History
Friday, August 09, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/12 7:44 AM
ORDER granting6 Office of the Attorney General's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/9/2024. (c/m 8/12/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/07 6:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 4) by Office of the Attorney General(Lee, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D Lee on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Lee, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 4:12 PM
ORDER directing Clerk to email Order and correspondence to Sandra Lee, Office of the Maryland Attorney General Correctional Litigation Unit; directing counsel to show cause as to why injunctive relief should not be granted in favor of Stockett. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/24/2024. (c/m 7/24/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 11:25 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/24/2024. (c/m 7/24/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 07/24 8:46 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Adrian Noble Stockett. (c/m 7/24/24- ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 8:44 AM
COMPLAINT against David Rounds, Jr, filed by Adrian Noble Stockett.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope