New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00439
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
James Bowers, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth K. Quinn
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Jason Immanuel Ser
Meister Seelig & Fein
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Marcia Sue Cohen
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/18/2025 11:00 AM EDT
Thursday, September 29, 2022
Arrest of James Bowers, Jr. (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs COMPLAINT as to James Bowers, Jr. (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to James Bowers, Jr. held on 9/29/2022. Bond Hearing as to James Bowers, Jr. held on 9/29/2022. AUSA Marcia Cohen for the Government. Elizabeth Quinn for the Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE; $60,000 PRB; 2 FRP; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS (& NO NEW APPLICATIONS); PRETRIAL SUPERVISION: AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; DRUG TESTING/TREATMT AS DIRECTED BY PTS; MENTAL HEALTH EVAL/TREATMT AS DIRECTED BY PTS; DEF. NOT TO POSSESS FIREARM/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICE/OTHER WEAPON. The defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the complaint waived. Elizabeth Quinn was appointed to represent the defendant for today's purposes only. Defendant released on agreed-upon conditions of bail. See Appearance Bond. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND Entered as to James Bowers, Jr. in amount of $60,000.00, Cosigned by 2 FRP by 10/6/22. The defendant must: submit to supervision by and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES FOR As Directed; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES; not obtain a passport or other international travel document; abide by the following restrictions on personal association, residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY; avoid all contact, directly or indirectly, with any person who is or may be a victim or witness in the investigation or prosecution; get medical or psychiatric treatment; mental health evaluation/treatment as directed by Pretrial Services; not possess a firearm, destructive device, or other weapon. not use or unlawfully possess a narcotic drug or other controlled substances defined in 21 U.S.C. § 802, unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner. submit to testing for a prohibited substance if required by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. Testing may be used with random frequency and may include urine testing, the wearing of a sweat patch, a remote alcohol testing system, and/or any form of prohibited substance screening or testing. The defendant must not obstruct, attempt to obstruct, or tamper with the efficiency and accuracy of prohibited substance screening or testing. participate in a program of inpatient or outpatient substance abuse therapy and counseling if directed by the pretrial services office or supervising officer; participate in one of the following location restriction programs and comply with its requirements as directed; Home Detention. You are restricted to your residence at all times except for employment; education; religious services;medical, substance abuse, or mental health treatment; attorney visits; court appearances; court-ordered obligations; or other activities approved in advance by the pretrial services office or supervising officer; Location monitoring technology as directed by the pretrial services or supervising officer; The defendant is permitted to self-install the location monitoring equipment. See Below1. Surrender all devices that the defendant currently possesses that are capable of Internet access, including smartphones and tablets, with the exception of one electronic device. The defendant shall be permitted to remain in possession of one device that will be subject to computer monitoring by Pretrial Services. 2. Refrain from Internet access through any type of device, except for the device that is being monitored by Pretrial Services 3. Refrain from access to or possessing pornographic material. 4. Refrain from any form of unsupervised contact with minors, including telephonic or online communication. 5. Refrain from loitering near schoolyards, playgrounds, or other places frequented by minors. 6. Refrain from using any electronic equipment including but not limited to cell phones and video or still cameras, to record, store, or view images or photos of minors. (ap) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/21/2022) (jbo). [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jason Immanuel Ser appearing for James Bowers, Jr. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
5 5 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 10/26/2022 until 11/23/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 10/26/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
6 6 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Jason Ser dated November 18, 2022 re: Temporary Modification of Pretrial Release . Document filed by James Bowers, Jr.. (Ser, Jason) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to James Bowers, Jr. (1) granting6 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Jason Ser dated November 18, 2022 re: Temporary Modification of Pretrial Release. ENDORSEMENT: Granted subject to #2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 11/18/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
8 8 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 11/23/2022 until 12/21/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 11/23/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of Marcia S. Cohen in Support by USA as to James Bowers, Jr. re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
10 10 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison, from Jason I. Ser dated 12/20/2022 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant must refrain from any unaccompanied contact with minors. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 12/20/2022) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
11 11 3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 12/21/2022 until 1/18/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 12/21/2022) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
12 12 AFFIRMATION of Marcia S. Cohen in Support by USA as to James Bowers, Jr. re:11 3RD Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
13 13 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 1/18/2023 until 2/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/18/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
14 14 AFFIRMATION of Marcia S. Cohen in Support by USA as to James Bowers, Jr. re:13 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
15 15 5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 2/15/2023 until 3/15/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 2/15/2023)(lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
16 16 AFFIRMATION of Marcia S. Cohen in Support by USA as to James Bowers, Jr. re:15 5TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
17 17 6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 3/15/2023 until 4/12/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 3/15/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
18 18 AFFIRMATION of Marcia S. Cohen in Support by USA as to James Bowers, Jr. re:17 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
19 19 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 7TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 4/12/23 until 5/10/23. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 4/12/2023)(jw) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
20 20 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 8TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 5/10/2023 until 6/7/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/10/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
21 21 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison from Jason I. Ser, dated 5/10/2023, re: Permission to travel.ENDORSEMENT: Defendant is granted leave to attend this Mother's Day event. However, he is prohibited from any unsupervised contact with minors. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 5/10/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
22 22 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 9TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE a as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 6/7/2023 until 7/5/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6/7/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
23 23 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy, from Jason I. Ser dated 6/27/2023 re: Defense counsel writes regarding conditions. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: Application granted. Mr. Bowers is permitted to attend July 4th festivities at his brother's home in Fishkill, NY on July 2, 2023 from 1:00 p,m, to 8:30 p.m. Mr. Bowers shall not be left unattended with any minors. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 6.28.2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
24 24 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 10TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 7/5/23 until 8/2/23. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 7/5/2023)(jw) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
25 25 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 11th ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 8/2/2023 until 8/30/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 8/2/2023) (ap)[7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
26 26 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy, from Jason I. Ser dated 8/22/2023 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 8/22/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
27 27 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 12TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 8/30/2023 until 9/27/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 8/30/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
28 28 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause, from Jason I. Ser dated 9/20/2023 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Mr. Bowers is hereby authorized to attend the family dinner in Hopewell Junction, New York, as specified in this application. Mr. Bowers must not be left unattended with any minors while at the dinner, or while traveling to or from the dinner. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 9/21/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
29 29 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy, from Jason I. Ser dated 9/28/2023 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted Mr. Bowers is permitted to spend the day at his brother's home in Fishkill, NY on October 1, 2023 from 1 :00 p.m. - 8:00 p.m. to celebrate his nephew's birthday. Mr. Bowers shall not be left unattended with any minors during this time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 9/28/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
30 30 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 13TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 9/27/2023 until 10/25/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 9/27/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
31 31 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 14th ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 10/25/2023 until 11/22/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 10/25/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
32 32 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy, from Jason I. Ser dated 11/20/2023 re: Defense counsel writes to request modifications of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Mr. Bowers is pe1mitted to spend from 12:00 p.m.to 9:00 p.m. on November 23, 2023 and December 25, 2023 at his brother's home in Fishkill, N.Y. Mr. Bowers shall not be left unattended with any minors during these times. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 11/20/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
33 33 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENTORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND15TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 11/22/2023 until 12/20/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 11/22/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
34 34 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 16TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 12/20/2023 until 1/17/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 12/20/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
35 35 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 17TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 1/17/2024 until 2/14/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/17/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
36 36 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from Jason I. Ser, dated 2/13/2024, re: Request for modification of conditions of release.ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Mr. Bowers is authorized to attend the funeral and memorial services in Wappiners Falls, NY on Saturday, February 17, 2024. During this period of modification to his conditions of releaes, Mr. Bowers must not be left unattended with any minors. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 2/13/2024)(lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
37 37 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 18TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 2/14/2024 until 3/13/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 2/14/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
38 38 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 19TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 3/13/2024 until 4/10/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/13/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
39 39 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 20TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 4/10/2024 until 5/8/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 4/10/2024) (lnl)[7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
40 40 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik from Jason I. Ser, dated 3/10/2024, re: Counsel writes to request that the Court modify the conditions of release imposed in this case as set forth. ENDORSEMENT: Application is GRANTED. Mr. Bowers may attend Mother's Day festivities on May 12, 2024 between 12 pm and 9 pm at his brother's residence in Fishkill, NY. Mr. Bowers MAY NOT be left unattended with any minors. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 5/8/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
41 41 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik from Jason I. Ser, dated 6/4/2024, re: Request for modification of the conditions of release as set forth. ENDORSEMENT: The defendants bail conditions are modified so that he may visit his mother at Vassar Brothers Medical Center in Poughkeepsie during her confinement there. The defendant is to coordinate these visits with Pretrial Services beforehand. The defendant shall not be left unattended with any minors during these visits. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 6/4/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
42 42 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 21ST ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr. Time excluded from 5/8/2024 until 6/5/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 5/8/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
44 44 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 22ND ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 6/5/2024 until 7/3/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 6/5/2024) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
43 43 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik, from Jason I. Ser dated 6/6/2024 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Bowers shall not be left unattended with minors. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 6/7/2024) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
45 45 ENDORSED LETTER as to James Bowers, Jr. addressed to Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy, from Jason I. Ser dated 7/2/2024 re: Defense counsel writes to request modification of conditions..ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. Mr. Bowers may attend July 4th festivities at his brother's home in Fishkill, NY on July 4, 2024 from 12:00 p.m. to 9:00 p.m. Mr. Bowers must not be left unattended with any minors during this time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 7/3/2024) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
46 46 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 23RD ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to James Bowers, Jr.. Time excluded from 7/3/2024 until 7/31/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 7/3/2024) (ap) [7:22-mj-07924-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to James Bowers, Jr. (lnl)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Arraignment as to James Bowers, Jr. (1) Count 1 held on 7/22/2024. AUSA Marcia Cohen present on behalf of the Government. Defense counsel Jason Ser present with the defendant. Court Reporter: Courtflow. The defendant waives indictment, and is arraigned on the one count Felony Information and waives public reading and enters a plea of not guilty. 5F obligations reviewed with the government. The case was assigned to Judge Roman. Speedy trial time is excluded to no later than August 5, 2024. Rule 5F obligations reviewed with the government. Defendants bail conditions continued. (lnl)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Plea entered by James Bowers, Jr. (1) Count 1 Not Guilty. (lnl)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman: Pretrial Conference as to James Bowers, Jr. held on 7/22/2024. Initial Appearance held. Defendant James Bowers, Jr. present with counsel Jason Ser, Esq. AUSA Marcia Cohen also present. Darby Ginsberg is court reporter. Judge Krause issued an oral order pursuant to R. 5(f). The Government acknowledges its obligations. The Government has produced discovery. Plea discussions have been held and a pretrial disposition is likely. An in-person Status Conference is scheduled for September 19, 2024 at 2:15 pm. The Court granted exclusion of speedy trial time, without objection by Defendant, from today, July 22, 2024, until September 19, 2024 in the interests of justice. Bail continued. (Status Conference set for 9/19/2024 at 02:15 PM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (jbo)
Related: [-]
47 47 1 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to James Bowers, Jr. (1) count(s) 1. (lnl)
Related: [-]
48 48 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by James Bowers, Jr. (lnl)
Related: [-]
49 49 3 pgs RULE 5(f) ORDER as to James Bowers, Jr. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 7/22/2024) (lnl)
Related: [-]