Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-05237
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 12:15 AM MST
Defendant
Donald Kirk Michael (1)
Represented By
Madeline Ann Mayer
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gayle L Helart
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
David A Pimsner
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 1:01 AM MST
Monday, July 22, 2024
1 1 Arrest (Rule 5 - Eastern District of Pennsylvania) of Donald Michael. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Donald Michael held on 7/23/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. IT IS ORDERED appointing AFPD Madeline Mayer for Defendant, for proceedings held in the District of Arizona only. Defendant states TRUE NAME to be DONALD KIRK MICHAEL. Further proceedings ordered in Defendant's true name. Identity Hearing waived. The Court accepts the Defendant's waiver and finds that identity has been established. The Government is seeking detention. Defense Counsel requests that a Detention Hearing be set and also states that the Defendant may retain counsel. Request GRANTED as set forth below. Based on the possibility that Defendant may retain counsel, the Court finds good cause to set the Detention Hearing on the date agreed upon by the parties. The Defendant is ordered temporarily detained and waives time. Appearances : AUSA David Pimsner for the Government, AFPD Madeline Mayer for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 7/30/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Related [+] Hearing held 3:38 PM to 3:44 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Donald Kirk Michael. (SST)
Related: [-]