Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:24-cr-00287
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 25, 2024 3:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Benjamin Crawford (1)
Represented By
Melissa Marie Kwitko
Todd Foster Law Group
contact info
Todd Alan Foster
Todd Foster Law Group, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Abigail King
Doj-Usao
contact info
James A. Muench
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 4:19 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
1 1 5 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Benjamin Crawford (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 2 pgs MOTION to Seal by USA as to Benjamin Crawford. (MCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal as to Benjamin Crawford (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 6/25/2024. (MCB)
Related: [-]