Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:24-cv-01904
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:11 AM CST
Defendant
Dusty Autrey
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Adrian Cooper
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Escoto
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Tonya Harris
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kim Kriegel
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Judd McCutchen
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Pitts
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Clay Schoolfield
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Debbie Timmermann
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Karina White
Represented By
Meredith Prykryl Walker
Walsh Gallegos Kyle Robinson & Roalson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Leslie Jefferson
Represented By
Walter Philmore Evans
Evans & Herlihy Law Firm
contact info
Walter Philmore Evans, IV
Evans/reilley
contact info
Michael J Laux
Laux Law Group
contact info
Timothy R Reilley
Evans/reilley
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew White
Represented By
Walter Philmore Evans, IV
Evans/reilley
contact info
Michael J Laux
Laux Law Group
contact info
Timothy R Reilley
Evans/reilley
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 03/31 10:01 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting31 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Doc. 25 Scheduling Order. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/30/2025. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/31/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/28 12:33 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct25 Scheduling Order, filed by Dusty Autrey, Adrian Cooper, Anthony Escoto, Tonya Harris, Kim Kriegel, Judd McCutchen, Ryan Pitts, Clay Schoolfield, Debbie Timmermann, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Karina White (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Mon 12/23 4:36 PM
REPLY filed by Clay Schoolfield, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Dusty Autrey, Kim Kriegel, Debbie Timmermann, Ryan Pitts, Adrian Cooper, Judd McCutchen re:16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Reply Mon 12/23 4:32 PM
REPLY filed by Karina White, Tonya Harris, Anthony Escoto re:14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
28 28 respm Response/Objection Tue 12/10 1:29 PM
RESPONSE filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White re:16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/10 9:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply Brief. Defendants Karina White, Tom Harris, and Anthony Escoto's Reply Brief in support of their Motion to Dismiss is due December 24, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/09 2:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karina White, Tonya Harris, Anthony Escoto (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/06 12:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 4/7/2026 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 4/18/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2025. Motions due by 11/6/2025. Discovery due by 10/6/2025. Pretrial Order due by 3/10/2026. Pretrial Materials due by 3/10/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/11/2025. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/6/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Protective Order Fri 12/06 9:13 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/6/2024) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Thu 12/05 3:25 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White. (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Protective Order Thu 12/05 10:09 AM
Agreed MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement filed by Clay Schoolfield, Karina White, Tonya Harris, Anthony Escoto, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Dusty Autrey, Kim Kriegel, Debbie Timmermann, Ryan Pitts, Adrian Cooper, Judd McCutchen (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/27 8:57 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' response now due December 10, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/27/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/26 9:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to17 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Leslie Jefferson (Evans, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 respm Response/Objection Tue 11/26 7:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White re:14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
18 18 7 pgs order Order Thu 11/14 10:25 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, lead counsel are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of submitting a Joint Status Report as follows. (Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order) (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/14/2024) (twd)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
17 17 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 11/11 5:54 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Clay Schoolfield, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Dusty Autrey, Kim Kriegel, Debbie Timmermann, Ryan Pitts, Adrian Cooper, Judd McCutchen re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/11 5:52 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Clay Schoolfield, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Dusty Autrey, Kim Kriegel, Debbie Timmermann, Ryan Pitts, Adrian Cooper, Judd McCutchen (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 11/11 5:49 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Karina White, Tonya Harris, Anthony Escoto re14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/11 5:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karina White, Tonya Harris, Anthony Escoto (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 28, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 11:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Andrew White, Leslie Jefferson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/15 7:21 PM
NOTICE of ADVISING COURT OF PLAINTIFFS' INTENT TO AMEND THEIR ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 10/08 2:08 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting10 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an Amended Complaint is October 28, 2024 and Defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint is November 11, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/8/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Mon 10/07 7:16 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time filed by Dusty Autrey, Adrian Cooper, Anthony Escoto, Tonya Harris, Kim Kriegel, Judd McCutchen, Ryan Pitts, Clay Schoolfield, Debbie Timmermann, Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee, Karina White with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Dusty Autrey(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Adrian Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Anthony Escoto(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Tonya Harris(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Kim Kriegel(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Judd McCutchen(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Ryan Pitts(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Clay Schoolfield(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Debbie Timmermann(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Waxahachie ISD Board of Trustee(pty:dft), Attorney Meredith Prykryl Walker added to party Karina White(pty:dft) (Walker, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Returned Mon 09/16 3:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants.) (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-DFS WAIVER OF SERVICE (001-011)
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
6 6 motion Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Wed 09/04 4:43 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Application for Pro Hac Vice filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White. (kcr)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Wed 09/04 10:04 AM
***DISREGARD - ORDER ENTERED IN ERROR*** (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/4/2024) (chmb) Modified on 9/4/2024 (cea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Document Tue 09/03 1:23 PM
(Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Leslie Jefferson, Andrew White (Laux, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-LAUX PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2-LAUX IL CERT OF GOOD STANDING
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 qcref Brown Thu 07/25 12:49 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 10:47 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Leslie Jefferson. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14790463) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Evans, Walter)
Related: [-]