Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:24-cv-01757
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 21, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
LST III LLC
Represented By
Samuel Olds Patmore
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Ezra Greenberg
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
John Nicholas Muratides
Stearns, Weaver, Miller, Weissler, Alhadeff & Sitterson, PA
contact info
Jay Brian Shapiro
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Life Equity LLC
Represented By
Samuel Olds Patmore
Stearns Weaver Miller
contact info
Ezra Greenberg
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
John Nicholas Muratides
Stearns, Weaver, Miller, Weissler, Alhadeff & Sitterson, PA
contact info
Jay Brian Shapiro
Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Jeffrey Carter Andersen
Represented By
Jeffrey Carter Andersen
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberta Purpora
Represented By
Joel J. Ewusiak
Ewusiak Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael J. Hoover
Interpleader Law, LLC
contact info
William J. Perry
Interpleader Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Purpora
Represented By
Joel J. Ewusiak
Ewusiak Law, P.A.
contact info
Michael J. Hoover
Interpleader Law, LLC
contact info
William J. Perry
Interpleader Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
35 35 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 01/22 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
34 34 order Order Tue 01/21 8:48 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Joint 33 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, the Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/21/2025. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/20 12:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by David Purpora, Alberta Purpora. (Hoover, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
32 32 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/13 4:29 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC.(Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of appearance Tue 11/05 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Greenberg on behalf of LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC (Greenberg, Ezra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/30 3:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. The motion is too fact-bound to decide at this stage. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/30/2024. (Jung, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
29 29 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 10/28 9:54 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery is due by 10/31/2025. Dispositive motions are due by 11/21/2025. Pretrial statement is due by 4/2/2026. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/9/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial is set for the May 2026 Trial Term commencing 5/4/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/28/2024. (JCG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
28 28 misc Case Management Report Fri 10/25 4:56 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hoover, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/24 4:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Alberta Purpora, David Purpora.(Hoover, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 13-October 23, 2020 Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit 14-September 25, 2020 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 15-October 14, 2020 Letter With Viatical Settlement Package
Thursday, October 17, 2024
26 26 order Order Thu 10/17 5:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to file a joint Uniform Case Management Report on or before 10/28/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/17/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Thu 10/03 7:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Life Equity LLC.(Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/18 5:16 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LST III LLC and Life Equity LLC's answer or response due 10/3/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/18/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 09/18 12:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC. (Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of appearance Wed 08/21 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Olds Patmore on behalf of LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC (Patmore, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/20 9:07 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LST III LLC and Life Equity LLC's answer or response due 9/19/2024. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/20/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 3:37 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC. (Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 08/19 3:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC. (Shapiro, Jay)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/13 12:06 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Attorney Michael Hoover and William Perry are admitted in this court pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/12/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Thu 08/01 2:53 PM
ORDER appointing Jeffrey Carter Andersen as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/1/2024. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
16 16 service Summons returned executed Wed 07/31 11:01 AM
RETURN of service executed on 7/30/2024 by David Purpora, Alberta Purpora as to LST III LLC. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons returned executed Wed 07/31 11:00 AM
RETURN of service executed on 7/30/2024 by David Purpora, Alberta Purpora as to Life Equity LLC. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
14 14 service Proof of service Tue 07/30 5:06 PM
PROOF of service by Alberta Purpora, David Purpora (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Proof of service Tue 07/30 5:05 PM
PROOF of service by Alberta Purpora, David Purpora (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 07/29 8:52 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 07/29 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JCG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
12 12 order Standing Order Tue 07/30 10:32 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/26/2024. (KMN)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons issued Fri 07/26 2:43 PM
SUMMONS issued as to LST III LLC, Life Equity LLC. (ELM)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 12:43 PM
MOTION for William Perry to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22339915 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 12:42 PM
MOTION for Michael Hoover to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22339841 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 07/26 12:03 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alberta Purpora, David Purpora. Related case(s): No (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 07/26 8:13 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michael Hoover and William Perry Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/26 8:12 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-1757-WFJ. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/25 4:02 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alberta Purpora, David Purpora. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 07/25 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joel J. Ewusiak on behalf of Alberta Purpora, David Purpora. Lead Counsel: Michael Hoover. (Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22335906) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Ewusiak, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons (Summons to Life Equity LLC),
Att: 3 Proposed Summons (Summons to LST III LLC)