Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joel H Slomsky
Case #: 2:24-cv-03332
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC.
1601 New Road Suite 100A
Northfield, NJ 08225
Represented By
JOSEPH G. GRADY
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
945 E. Paces Ferry Road Suite 1800
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
MARTIN J. BECK
Mccormick Priore PC
contact info
CHRISTOPHER S. REGAN
Mccormick & Priore, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN SIRACUSA
1601 New Road Suite 100A
Northfield, NJ 08225
Represented By
JOSEPH G. GRADY
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Defendant
SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC
1601 New Road Suite 1800
Northfield, NJ 08225
Represented By
JOSEPH G. GRADY
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.
1155 Main Street
Linfield, PA 19468
Represented By
JAMES C. HAGGERTY
Hgsk
contact info
DENNIS COYNE
Haggerty Goldberg Schleifer & Kupersmith, PC
contact info

GPO Mar 05 2025
OPINION SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/5/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
GPO Mar 05 2025
ORDER THAT THAT LANDMARKS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 7) IS GRANTED IN AS TO COUNTS IV AND V AND DENIED AS TO COUNT I. LANDMARK SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS REMAINING IN THE COMPLAINT BY MARCH 19, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/5/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)

Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 9:56 AM
NOTICE by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC., BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC. of Intent to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Landmark Counterclaims(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Tue 05/13 12:47 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Pretrial Conference, scheduled for 5/13/2025(kah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
26 26 misc Report Of Fri 05/09 2:35 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (REGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 motion Strike Wed 04/30 2:39 PM
MOTION to Strike filed by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.certificate of service, certificate of counsel.(BECK, MARTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/17 3:24 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/13/2025 AT 4:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 4/17/2025. 4/17/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 respoth Response Wed 04/09 4:04 PM
Response to Counterclaim of Landmark re21 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC., BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.. (HAGGERTY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service and Compliance
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
22 22 misc Jury Demand Wed 04/02 12:29 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BECK, MARTIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 03/19 10:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses and COUNTERCLAIM against BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC. by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(BECK, MARTIN) Modified on 3/19/2025 (md)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit H
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Order Setting Answer Deadline Thu 03/06 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT THAT LANDMARKS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.7 ) IS GRANTED IN AS TO COUNTS IV AND V AND DENIED AS TO COUNT I. LANDMARK SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO THE CLAIMS REMAINING IN THE COMPLAINT BY MARCH 19, 2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/5/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
19 19 26 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Thu 03/06 9:18 AM
OPINION SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/5/25. 3/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 02/24 4:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY Motion Hearing held on 2/24/25 re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Tue 02/04 2:03 PM
ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 7) IS RESCHEDULED FOR 2/24/2025 AT 10:30 AM IN Courtroom 13A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/4/2025. 2/4/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Mon 02/03 3:56 PM
Letter dated February 3, 2025 by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC.. (HAGGERTY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 02/03 1:06 PM
ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 7) IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/10/2025 AT 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 13A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/3/2025. 2/3/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS COYNE on behalf of BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC. with Certificate of Service(COYNE, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/15 12:20 PM
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO.7 ) WILL BE HELD ON FEBRUARY 7, 2025 AT 10:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 13A. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/15/25. 1/15/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
12 12 misc Letter Tue 01/14 4:17 PM
Letter dated 1/10/25 from Plaintiff's Counsel to Chambers, re: Mediation and Request for Scheduling Order. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 12/03 4:47 PM
ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS SCHEDULED FOR 12/3/2024 AT 2:30 P.M. IS CANCELED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL UPDATE THE COURT ON THE OUTCOME OF THE 1/8/2025 MEDIATION BY LETTER FILED OR RECORD BY 1/20/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/3/2024. 12/3/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Tue 12/03 3:52 PM
Letter to Chambers dated 12/3/24 from Martin J. Beck re: Mediation. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/03 5:08 PM
ORDER THAT A MOTION HEARING RE7 MOTION TO DISMISS IS SET FOR 12/3/2024 AT 02:30 PM IN COURTROOM 13A, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 10/3/24. 10/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/15 1:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC..(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service and compliance
Thursday, August 01, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Thu 08/01 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(REGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/01 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., JOHN SIRACUSA, SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC.(GRADY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/01 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARTIN J. BECK on behalf of LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (BECK, MARTIN)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 08/01 10:21 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by LANDMARK AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(REGAN, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 discov Disclosure Tue 07/30 12:24 PM
Disclosure by BENGAL CONVERTING SERVICES, INC..(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 07/25 4:21 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., JOHN SIRACUSA, SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC.(GRADY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Thu 07/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHN SIRACUSA, INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626509), filed by JOHN SIRACUSA, INSURANCE AGENCIES, INC., SIRACUSA-KAUFMANN INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC.(GRADY, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Writ of Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-Phila. Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit C-Siracusa Cert. of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit D-Landmakr Cert of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit E-Philadelphia Docket Sheet,
Att: 7 Designation Form