Colorado District Court
Judge:Gordon P Gallagher
Case #: 1:24-cv-02050
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 1:19 AM MST
Defendant
Angie Cooper
Represented By
Emily Lauren Wasserman
Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP
contact info
Erin McNally Gust
Erin M. Gust, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Brian Cooper
Represented By
Emily Lauren Wasserman
Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP
contact info
Erin McNally Gust
Erin M. Gust, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Core Title Group LLC
Represented By
Emily Lauren Wasserman
Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP
contact info
Erin McNally Gust
Erin M. Gust, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Stewart Title Company
Represented By
Gregory Scot Tamkin
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Brittany Lynn Garza
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
55 55 order Minute Order Tue 04/01 12:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Motion Hearing set for April 21, 2025 is hereby VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/1/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
54 54 order Order Mon 03/31 2:27 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Notice of Settlement and hereby Orders that either Dismissal Papers of a Joint Status Report shall be filed by 5/16/2025. By District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on March 31, 2025. Text Only Entry. (gpglc3)
Related: [-]
53 53 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/31 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Stewart Title Company (Garza, Brittany)
Related: [-]