Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:24-cv-03169
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
COHEN MARRACCINI LLC
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
JENEL R. MARRACCINI
Cohen Marraccini, LLC
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
JENEL R. MARRACCINI
Cohen Marraccini, LLC
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE GRANT APARTMENTS
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY
1 CYNWYD ROAD PH-6
LOWER MERION, PA 19004
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
JENEL R. MARRACCINI
Cohen Marraccini, LLC
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
JENEL R. MARRACCINI
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL RUDIN
Terminated: 01/14/2025
Represented By
Noah P Speitel
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
MARK W. FIDANZA
Reed Smith LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
49 49 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/19 1:02 PM
PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
48 48 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/14 1:53 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re47 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Thursday, February 13, 2025
47 47 motion Dismiss Thu 02/13 11:11 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., THE GRANT APARTMENTS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
46 46 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/03 8:28 AM
NOTICE FROM CHAMBERS. (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
45 45 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/31 10:29 AM
ORDER THAT THE COURT FINDS THAT A REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IS IMPLICIT IN PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXERCISES ITS DISCRETION TO GRANT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST. THE COURT THUS ACCEPTS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS THE OPERATIVE PLEADING AND FINDS THAT IT SUPERSEDES PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT.1 BECAUSE THE COURT GRANTED PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND AND ALLOWED HER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE THE OPERATIVE PLEADING, THE COURT DENIES AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 34). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 20, 2025. 4.IF DEFENDANTS FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS, PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL MONDAY, MARCH17, 2025, TO FILE A RESPONSE.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/30/2025.1/31/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
44 44 minutes Status Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 01/31 10:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTONin Courtroom 15-B Status Conference held on 1/30/2025. Court Reporter: LYNN GLIGOR, RMR. (sg)
Related: [-]
43 43 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 1:08 PM
ORDER OF 1/30/25 THAT PLAINTIFF'S RECUSAL REQUEST (DOC. 38), DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE (DOC. 41), AND PLAINTIFF'S REPLY (DOC. 42), IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST IS DENIED. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/30/25. 1/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/30 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/30/2025 AT 11:30 AM IN COURTROOM 15-B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. (mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
42 42 respoth Response Thu 01/30 9:47 AM
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' LETTER DATED 1/28/2025, by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY. (sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER LETTER
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Tue 01/28 2:48 PM
Letter dated January 28, 2025 by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, COHEN MARRACCINI LLC.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, January 23, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/24 9:45 AM
ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/30/2025 11:30 AM IN Courtroom TBD BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/23/2025. 1/24/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
39 39 respoth Response Wed 01/22 8:54 AM
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LETTER CONCERNING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY. (sg)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Praecipe/Request Wed 01/22 8:53 AM
REQUEST FOR RECUSAL BASED ON APPEARANCE OF BIAS, by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY. (sg)
Related: [-]
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 01/21 9:03 AM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 35) AND DEFENDANTS LETTER (DOC. NO. 36), IT IS ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A WRITTEN RESPONSE OF NO MORE THAN 2 DOUBLE-SPACED PAGES TO DEFENDANTS LETTER BY WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 22, 2025. IN HER RESPONSE, PLAINTIFF MUST ADDRESS: (1) WHY SHE DID NOT ASK FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; (2) WHY SHE DID NOT MEET AND CONFER WITH DEFENDANTS, (3) WHY SHE DID NOT SERVE DEFENDANTS, AND (4) WHY SHE DID NOT FILE A REDLINE OF HER AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSISTENT WITH THIS COURTS POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. SEE THE HONORABLE KAREN SPENCER MARSTON, POLICIES AND PROCEDURES AT 10. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 1/17/2025. 1/21/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
36 36 misc Letter Thu 01/16 3:40 PM
Letter dated 1/16/25 by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, JENEL R. MARRACCINI, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, COHEN MARRACCINI LLC. (FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
35 35 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/15 9:31 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., THE GRANT APARTMENTS, filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
34 34 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, JENEL R. MARRACCINI, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, COHEN MARRACCINI LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noah P Speitel on behalf of NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, JENEL R. MARRACCINI with Certificate of Service(Speitel, Noah)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/10 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK W. FIDANZA on behalf of NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, JENEL R. MARRACCINI with Certificate of Service(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/10 1:35 PM
NOTICE FROM CHAMBERS RE: THE COURT RECEIVED PLAINTIFFS PROOF OF SERVICE, WHICH WAS MAILEDDIRECTLY TO CHAMBERS. (SEE DOC. NO. 30.) THE COURT REMINDS PLAINTIFF THAT ANY FILINGS SHOULD BEMADE ELECTRONICALLY ON CM/ECF OR OTHERWISE MAILED TO THE CLERKS OFFICE AND SERVED ON DEFENSECOUNSEL. PLAINTIFF SHOULD REFRAIN FROM ATTEMPTING TO FILE ANY MORE DOCUMENTS BY MAILING THEM TOCHAMBERS.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Thu 01/09 3:42 PM
Letter by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY (sg)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noah P Speitel on behalf of COHEN MARRACCINI LLC with Certificate of Service(Speitel, Noah)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK W. FIDANZA on behalf of COHEN MARRACCINI LLC with Certificate of Service(FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
27 27 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Mon 12/23 3:09 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT GRANTS DEFENDANTS EXTENSION REQUESTS (DOC. NO. 12; DOC.NO. 13) AND DENIES AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT (DOC. NO. 19).DEFENDANTS MUST RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN FRIDAY, JANUARY 10,2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/23/2024.12/23/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
26 26 minutes Status Conference Tue 12/17 5:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON Status Conference held on 12/16/24. Court Reporter: LYNN GLIGOR. (JL)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Letter Tue 12/17 3:36 PM
Letter dated 12/17/2024 by JENEL R. MARRACCINI, COHEN MARRACCINI LLC.(MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 12/17 1:27 PM
ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. ON SEPTEMBER 3, 2024, PLAINTIFF AASIYAH PRESSLEY FILED AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT NAMED FIVE NEW DEFENDANTS: MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP (MRE), NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, AND JENEL R. MARRACCINI. (SEE DOC. NO. 8.) THE CLERKS OFFICE ISSUED SUMMONS FOR THESE DEFENDANTS THE FOLLOWING DAY. (SEE DOC. NO. 9.) ALTHOUGH MRE IS NOW REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL, THERE HAVE BEEN NO NOTICES OF APPEARANCES FILED ON BEHALF OF THE OTHER FOUR DEFENDANTS. PLAINTIFF HAS NOT FILED PROOF OF SERVICE OF THESE DEFENDANTS, AND THE 90-DAY WINDOW FOR TIMELY SERVICE HAS PASSED. SEE FED. R. CIV. P. 4(M). 2. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF MUST MAKE SERVICE BY FRIDAY, JANUARY 3, 2025, ON THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS: A. NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO. B. KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP C. DANIEL RUDIN D. JENEL R. MARRACCINI. THIS ORDER ALSO SERVES AS NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF, IN ACCORDANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 4(M), THAT IF SHE FAILS TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE BY FRIDAY, JANUARY 10, 2025, WITHOUT SHOWING GOOD CAUSE FOR SUCH FAILURE, THE COURT MUST DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE CASE AGAINST UNSERVED DEFENDANTS.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/17/2024. 12/17/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
23 23 trial Exhibit Fri 12/13 11:40 AM
EXHIBIT to Docket Entry # 21 by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT.. (FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Praecipe/Request Fri 12/13 11:03 AM
Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. (FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
22 22 misc Praecipe/Request Fri 12/13 11:15 AM
OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY. (rf, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/12 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2024 AT 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 10-B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON.(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Noah P Speitel on behalf of THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT with Certificate of Service(Speitel, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 motion Declaratory Judgment Wed 12/11 9:36 AM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY..(sg)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/10 3:59 PM
ORDER, FOLLOWING A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH THEPARTIES, A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, DECEMBER 16, 2024, AT 10:00A.M. IN A COURTROOM TO BE DETERMINED AT THE JAMES A. BYRNE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 601MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 12/10/2024. 12/10/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint) Tue 12/10 12:25 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. Amendment to16 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Certificate of Service . (MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 12/10 12:21 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JENEL R. MARRACCINI on behalf of THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT(MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Tue 12/10 12:14 PM
Letter dated 12/10/2024 by COHEN MARRACCINI LLC. (MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 respoth Response Tue 12/10 6:49 AM
Response in Opposition by Pro Se Plaintiff AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY to Request for an Extension of time to respond to amended complaint. (dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/09 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/9/2024 at 2:30 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON.(mr)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 07, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Sat 12/07 9:42 AM
Letter dated December 7, 2024 by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, JENEL R. MARRACCINI, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, COHEN MARRACCINI LLC.(MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Draft Motion to Dismiss
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Fri 12/06 3:49 PM
Letter dated 12/06/2024 by THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. (FIDANZA, MARK)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK W. FIDANZA on behalf of THE GRANT APARTMENTS, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT with Certificate of Service(FIDANZA, MARK) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/6/2024) (nd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/25 1:43 PM
ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PLAINTIFF FILING AN AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 8), IT IS ORDERED THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 7), WHICH RELATES TO THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 9/25/2024.9/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 09/04 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, JENEL R. MARRACCINI, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., DANIEL RUDIN. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 9/4/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/04 11:39 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, THE GRANT APARTMENTS, NEW YORK LIFE INSURANCE CO., MACK REAL ESTATE GROUP, KOHLBERG KRAVIS ROBERTS & CO. LP, DANIEL RUDIN, JENEL R. MARRACCINI, filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/20 5:53 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) , First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, THE GRANT APARTMENTS.Brief.(MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENEL R. MARRACCINI on behalf of COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, THE GRANT APARTMENTS (MARRACCINI, JENEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 trial Exhibit Wed 07/31 10:53 AM
EXHIBITS FILED BY AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY..(mas) Modified on 7/31/2024 (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 COVER SHEET
Monday, July 29, 2024
misc Remark Mon 07/29 10:04 AM
Four Summons (Doc. #4 ) mailed to plaintiff. (fb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/26 12:02 PM
Summons Issued as to COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, THE GRANT APARTMENTS on 7/26/2024. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 07/26 11:58 AM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20022118 (sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Thu 07/25 2:05 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES, MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT against COHEN MARRACCINI LLC, KRE MREG CYNWYD OWNER LLC, MACK PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, THE GRANT APARTMENTS, filed by AASIYAH J. PRESSLEY.(sg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EXHIBITS