DIPALO v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Lead case: 2:24-md-03094
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03348 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
LILLY CORPORATE CENTER
INDIANAPOLIS, IN 46285 |
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
800 Scudders Mill Road
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 |
|
Plaintiff
JOHN J DIPALO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/26/24 (bw) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Fri 07/26 9:59 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3348. (sbt) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT of JOHN J. DIPALO against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17626856.), filed by JOHN J DIPALO.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |