Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-03667
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 12:49 AM MST
Defendant
Fernando Pina-Santana (1)
Represented By
Saul Martin Huerta, Jr.
Saul M Huerta Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/26/2024 2:36 AM MST
Sunday, July 21, 2024
Arrest of Fernando Pina-Santana on 7/21/2024. (CXE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fernando Pina-Santana. (CXE)
Related: [-]